Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Financial Institutions -see also- Banks; Credit Unions; etc.

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0312 (SB0077/CH0008)
Title
Commercial Law - Secured Transactions - False Financing Statements
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0372
Title
Real Property - Vacant and Abandoned Residential Property
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0558 /CH0095 (SB0515)
Title
Financial Institutions - Depository Institutions - Savings Promotion Raffles
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0737 /CH0337 (SB0288/CH0336)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Financial Crimes Against Vulnerable and Elder Adults - Petition to Freeze Assets
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0929 (SB0756)
Title
Prince George's County - Foreclosure Relief Act of 2015 PG 423-15
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0953 (SB0372)
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - First-Time Homebuyer Savings Accounts
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1100
Title
Fiduciary Institutions - Disclosure of Financial Records - Federal Investigation Agencies
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1178 /CH0301
Title
Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Exemption - Purchase Money Mortgage or Purchase Money Deed of Trust
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1184 (SB0835)
Title
Real Property - Foreclosure Moratorium and Study (Foreclosure Relief Act of 2015)
Sponsor
Delegate Knotts
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0077 /CH0008 (HB0312)
Title
Commercial Law - Secured Transactions - False Financing Statements
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0288 /CH0336 (HB0737/CH0337)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Financial Crimes Against Vulnerable and Elder Adults - Petition to Freeze Assets
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0372 (HB0953)
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - First-Time Homebuyer Savings Accounts
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0515 (HB0558/CH0095)
Title
Financial Institutions - Depository Institutions - Savings Promotion Raffles
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0548
Title
Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0756 (HB0929)
Title
Prince George's County - Foreclosure Relief Act of 2015
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0835 (HB1184)
Title
Real Property - Foreclosure Moratorium and Study (Foreclosure Relief Act of 2015)
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0312 (SB0077/CH0008) Commercial Law - Secured Transactions - False Financing Statements Chair, Economic Matters Committee 6 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Economic Matters
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0372 Real Property - Vacant and Abandoned Residential Property Delegate Walker 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0558 /CH0095 (SB0515) Financial Institutions - Depository Institutions - Savings Promotion Raffles Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 95
Economic Matters
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0737 /CH0337 (SB0288/CH0336) Criminal Procedure - Financial Crimes Against Vulnerable and Elder Adults - Petition to Freeze Assets Delegate Wilson, B. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 337
Judiciary
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0929 (SB0756) Prince George's County - Foreclosure Relief Act of 2015 PG 423-15 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB0953 (SB0372) Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - First-Time Homebuyer Savings Accounts Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1100 Fiduciary Institutions - Disclosure of Financial Records - Federal Investigation Agencies Delegate Miller, W. 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Economic Matters
HB1178 /CH0301 Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Exemption - Purchase Money Mortgage or Purchase Money Deed of Trust Delegate Lafferty 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 301
Environment and Transportation
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1184 (SB0835) Real Property - Foreclosure Moratorium and Study (Foreclosure Relief Act of 2015) Delegate Knotts 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0077 /CH0008 (HB0312) Commercial Law - Secured Transactions - False Financing Statements Chair, Finance Committee 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 8
Finance
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0288 /CH0336 (HB0737/CH0337) Criminal Procedure - Financial Crimes Against Vulnerable and Elder Adults - Petition to Freeze Assets Senator Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 336
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0372 (HB0953) Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - First-Time Homebuyer Savings Accounts Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0515 (HB0558/CH0095) Financial Institutions - Depository Institutions - Savings Promotion Raffles Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Finance
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0548 Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Revisions Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0756 (HB0929) Prince George's County - Foreclosure Relief Act of 2015 Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Rosapepe)
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0835 (HB1184) Real Property - Foreclosure Moratorium and Study (Foreclosure Relief Act of 2015) Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM