Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Financial Institutions -see also- Banks; Credit Unions; etc.

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0142 (SB0033)
Title
Financial Institutions - Mortgage Lenders - Examinations and Records
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0230
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - First-Time Homebuyer Savings Accounts
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0525
Title
Maryland Mortgage Lender Law - Mortgage Lender - Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0568
Title
Financial Institutions - Credit Unions - Liens and Rights to a Setoff
Sponsor
Delegate Shoemaker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0718 /CH0266 (SB0206/CH0265)
Title
Financial Institutions - Qualifications of Directors of Commercial Banks - Residency
Sponsor
Delegate Carey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0752 /CH0203 (SB0671/CH0202)
Title
Department of Human Resources - Public Assistance Eligibility - Financial Records
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0782 (SB0402)
Title
Insurance - Impaired Entities - Delinquency Proceedings
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0872
Title
Tax Credits - Enterprise Zones, RISE Zones, and Maryland Jobs Development Projects
Sponsor
Chair, Ways and Means Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0974 /CH0518 (SB0525)
Title
Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Carey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1518
Title
Interception of Communication - Financial Institutions
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1638
Title
Employee Ownership Trusts
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0004
Title
Reinstatement of the Separation of Commercial and Investment Banking Functions
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0206 /CH0265 (HB0718/CH0266)
Title
Financial Institutions - Qualifications of Directors of Commercial Banks - Residency
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0283
Title
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation - Reverse Mortgages - Escrow Accounts
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0392 /CH0484
Title
Credit Regulation - Closed End Credit Loans - Elimination of Duplicative Disclosures
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0402 (HB0782)
Title
Insurance - Impaired Entities - Delinquency Proceedings
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0525 (HB0974/CH0518)
Title
Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0671 /CH0202 (HB0752/CH0203)
Title
Department of Human Resources - Public Assistance Eligibility - Financial Records
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1101
Title
Reverse Mortgages - Property Tax and Insurance Payments - Notice
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0142 (SB0033) Financial Institutions - Mortgage Lenders - Examinations and Records Chair, Economic Matters Committee 6 2 In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0230 Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - First-Time Homebuyer Savings Accounts Delegate Morales 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0525 Maryland Mortgage Lender Law - Mortgage Lender - Definition Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0568 Financial Institutions - Credit Unions - Liens and Rights to a Setoff Delegate Shoemaker 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0718 /CH0266 (SB0206/CH0265) Financial Institutions - Qualifications of Directors of Commercial Banks - Residency Delegate Carey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 266
Economic Matters
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0752 /CH0203 (SB0671/CH0202) Department of Human Resources - Public Assistance Eligibility - Financial Records Delegate Kelly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 203
Appropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0782 (SB0402) Insurance - Impaired Entities - Delinquency Proceedings Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0872 Tax Credits - Enterprise Zones, RISE Zones, and Maryland Jobs Development Projects Chair, Ways and Means Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0974 /CH0518 (SB0525) Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Revisions Delegate Carey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 518
Economic Matters
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1518 Interception of Communication - Financial Institutions Delegate Adams 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1638 Employee Ownership Trusts Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HJ0004 Reinstatement of the Separation of Commercial and Investment Banking Functions Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0206 /CH0265 (HB0718/CH0266) Financial Institutions - Qualifications of Directors of Commercial Banks - Residency Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 265
Finance
1/31/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0283 Commercial Law - Credit Regulation - Reverse Mortgages - Escrow Accounts Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0392 /CH0484 Credit Regulation - Closed End Credit Loans - Elimination of Duplicative Disclosures Senator Hershey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 484
Finance
2/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0402 (HB0782) Insurance - Impaired Entities - Delinquency Proceedings Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0525 (HB0974/CH0518) Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Revisions Senator Lee 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0671 /CH0202 (HB0752/CH0203) Department of Human Resources - Public Assistance Eligibility - Financial Records Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 202
Finance
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1101 Reverse Mortgages - Property Tax and Insurance Payments - Notice Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM