Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Financial Institutions -see also- Banks; Credit Unions; etc.

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0059 /CH0090
Title
Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Debt Settlement Services
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0061 /CH0092
Title
Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Mortgage Lenders, Loan Servicers, and Loan Originators
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0594 /CH0546 (SB0670)
Title
Financial Institutions - Student Loan Servicers - Unfair, Abusive, or Deceptive Trade Practices
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0816
Title
Financial Institutions - Maryland Mortgage Lender Law - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1127 (SB0786)
Title
Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2019
Sponsor
Delegate Carey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1188
Title
Interception of Communication - Financial Institutions
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1216
Title
Financial Institutions - Check Cashing Services - Licensing
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1266 /CH0732 (SB0754)
Title
National Capital Strategic Economic Development Program - Established
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1307
Title
Marijuana Laws - Full Disclosure of Legal, Employment, and Health Risks
Sponsor
Delegate Impallaria
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1340
Title
Task Force to Study the Local Economic Impact of Bank Deserts in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0051 /CH0143
Title
Maryland Heritage Areas Authority – Acquisition or Development Grants – Repeal of Target Investment Zones
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0067 /CH0087
Title
Financial Institutions – Disclosure of Information From Investigations
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0633
Title
Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Mortgage Lenders, Originators, and Servicers - Workgroup and Regulations
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0670 (HB0594/CH0546)
Title
Financial Institutions - Student Loan Servicers - Unfair, Abusive, or Deceptive Trade Practices
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0732 /CH0304 (HB1283)
Title
Child in Need of Assistance – Guardianship by Local Department – Financial Accounts
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0754 (HB1266/CH0732)
Title
National Capital Strategic Economic Development Program - Established
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0059 /CH0090 Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Debt Settlement Services Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 90
Economic Matters
1/30/2019 - 3:00 PM
Finance
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0061 /CH0092 Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Mortgage Lenders, Loan Servicers, and Loan Originators Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 92
Economic Matters
1/30/2019 - 3:00 PM
Finance
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0594 /CH0546 (SB0670) Financial Institutions - Student Loan Servicers - Unfair, Abusive, or Deceptive Trade Practices Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 546
Economic Matters
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0816 Financial Institutions - Maryland Mortgage Lender Law - Exemption Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB1127 (SB0786) Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2019 Delegate Carey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1188 Interception of Communication - Financial Institutions Delegate Adams 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
HB1216 Financial Institutions - Check Cashing Services - Licensing Delegate Washington 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1266 /CH0732 (SB0754) National Capital Strategic Economic Development Program - Established Delegate Washington 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 732
Appropriations
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Budget and Taxation
HB1307 Marijuana Laws - Full Disclosure of Legal, Employment, and Health Risks Delegate Impallaria 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1340 Task Force to Study the Local Economic Impact of Bank Deserts in Maryland Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0051 /CH0143 Maryland Heritage Areas Authority – Acquisition or Development Grants – Repeal of Target Investment Zones Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 143
Finance
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/02/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0067 /CH0087 Financial Institutions – Disclosure of Information From Investigations Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 87
Finance
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0633 Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Mortgage Lenders, Originators, and Servicers - Workgroup and Regulations Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0670 (HB0594/CH0546) Financial Institutions - Student Loan Servicers - Unfair, Abusive, or Deceptive Trade Practices President 6 2 In the House - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Finance
3/12/2019 - 9:00 AM
Economic Matters
SB0732 /CH0304 (HB1283) Child in Need of Assistance – Guardianship by Local Department – Financial Accounts Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 304
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0754 (HB1266/CH0732) National Capital Strategic Economic Development Program - Established Senator Peters 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Appropriations and Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Appropriations
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:24 PM