Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Financial Regulation, Division of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0225 /CH0155 (SB0273/CH0154)
Title
Veterans Full Employment Act of 2013
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0291 /CH0465 (SB0383/CH0464)
Title
Real Property - Maryland Mortgage Assistance Relief Services Act
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0811
Title
Residential Property - Foreclosure of Liens by Common Ownership Communities
Sponsor
Delegate Niemann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1306
Title
Public Banking Institutions - Authorization and Task Force
Sponsor
Delegate Gutierrez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1368
Title
Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Regulation of Mortgage Lenders, Mortgage Loan Originators, and Money Transmitters - Revisions
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0273 /CH0154 (HB0225/CH0155)
Title
Veterans Full Employment Act of 2013
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0383 /CH0464 (HB0291/CH0465)
Title
Real Property - Maryland Mortgage Assistance Relief Services Act
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0225 /CH0155 (SB0273/CH0154) Veterans Full Employment Act of 2013 Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 155
Health and Government Operations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0291 /CH0465 (SB0383/CH0464) Real Property - Maryland Mortgage Assistance Relief Services Act Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 465
Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Judicial Proceedings
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0811 Residential Property - Foreclosure of Liens by Common Ownership Communities Delegate Niemann 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1306 Public Banking Institutions - Authorization and Task Force Delegate Gutierrez 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1368 Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Regulation of Mortgage Lenders, Mortgage Loan Originators, and Money Transmitters - Revisions Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0273 /CH0154 (HB0225/CH0155) Veterans Full Employment Act of 2013 President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 154
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/07/2013 - 1:45 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0383 /CH0464 (HB0291/CH0465) Real Property - Maryland Mortgage Assistance Relief Services Act Senator Raskin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 464
Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Environmental Matters
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM