Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Fingerprinting

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0188
Title
Public Safety - Handgun Permits - Renewal Period for Retired Law Enforcement Officer
Sponsor
Delegate Cluster
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0306
Title
Firearm Decriminalization Act of 2015
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0490 /CH0251
Title
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Miscellaneous Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0574 (SB0449/CH0034)
Title
State Board of Physicians - Physicians, Physician Assistants, and Allied Health Practitioners - Licensure Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0742 (SB0201/CH0331)
Title
State Board for the Certification of Residential Child Care Program Professionals - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1024
Title
Public Safety - Renewal of Handgun Permits - Fingerprinting
Sponsor
Delegate Saab
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1110 /CH0298
Title
Law Enforcement - Special Police Officers
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1237 /CH0305
Title
Police and Correctional Training Commissions - Applicants - Criminal History Records Checks
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0201 /CH0331 (HB0742)
Title
State Board for the Certification of Residential Child Care Program Professionals - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0391 /CH0167
Title
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Licenses, Permits, and Registrations - Processes and Criminal History Records Checks
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0449 /CH0034 (HB0574)
Title
State Board of Physicians - Physicians, Physician Assistants, and Allied Health Practitioners - Licensure Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0787
Title
Drivers' Licenses, Identification Cards, and Moped Operators' Permits - Enhanced Identification Documents
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0868 /CH0204 (HB1231)
Title
Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services and For-Hire Transportation
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0912
Title
Kent County - Prospective Employees and Volunteers - Criminal History Records Check
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0188 Public Safety - Handgun Permits - Renewal Period for Retired Law Enforcement Officer Delegate Cluster 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0306 Firearm Decriminalization Act of 2015 Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0490 /CH0251 Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Miscellaneous Revisions Delegate Morhaim 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 251
Health and Government Operations
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0574 (SB0449/CH0034) State Board of Physicians - Physicians, Physician Assistants, and Allied Health Practitioners - Licensure Requirements Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0742 (SB0201/CH0331) State Board for the Certification of Residential Child Care Program Professionals - Revisions Delegate Hayes 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1024 Public Safety - Renewal of Handgun Permits - Fingerprinting Delegate Saab 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1110 /CH0298 Law Enforcement - Special Police Officers Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 298
Judiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1237 /CH0305 Police and Correctional Training Commissions - Applicants - Criminal History Records Checks Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 305
Judiciary
3/20/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0201 /CH0331 (HB0742) State Board for the Certification of Residential Child Care Program Professionals - Revisions Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 331
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0391 /CH0167 State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Licenses, Permits, and Registrations - Processes and Criminal History Records Checks Senator Montgomery 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 167
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0449 /CH0034 (HB0574) State Board of Physicians - Physicians, Physician Assistants, and Allied Health Practitioners - Licensure Requirements Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 34
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0787 Drivers' Licenses, Identification Cards, and Moped Operators' Permits - Enhanced Identification Documents Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0868 /CH0204 (HB1231) Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services and For-Hire Transportation Senator Ferguson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 204
Finance
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0912 Kent County - Prospective Employees and Volunteers - Criminal History Records Check Senator Hershey 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM