Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Fish and Fishing -see also- Aquaculture; Gill Nets

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0118 /CH0383
Title
Task Force to Study the Impact of Ocean Acidification on State Waters
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0145 (SB0145)
Title
Natural Resources - Fisheries Management - Regulations
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0154 /CH0587
Title
Natural Resources - Sport Fisheries Advisory Commission - Membership
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0618 (SB0437)
Title
Nonresident Recreational Fishing and Crabbing Licenses - Oyster Restoration Surcharge
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0675
Title
Recreational Hunting or Fishing License Applications - Disclosure of Information
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0769
Title
Recreational Hunting or Fishing License Applications - Disclosure of Information
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0913
Title
Food Fish and Shellfish - Labeling and Identification Requirements (Maryland Seafood Authenticity and Enforcement Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1104
Title
Striped Bass Allocation - Individual Transferable Quotas - Prohibited
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1148 /CH0446
Title
Recreational Striped Bass Fishery - Study on Harvest Data
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1153 /CH0642 (SB0929)
Title
Commercial Fishing and Seafood Operations - Nuisance Actions - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1155 (SB0466)
Title
Oyster Dredging - Waters North of the Chesapeake Bay Bridge and Kent Narrows Bridge
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1174 /CH0448
Title
Recreational Hunting or Fishing Licenses - Denial, Suspension, and Required Disclosure
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1520
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - Hunting and Sporting Goods
Sponsor
Delegate Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1551 (SB1111)
Title
Natural Resources - Fresh Oyster Shells - Purchase by County Oyster Committees
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0093 /CH0022
Title
Natural Resources - Recreational Incentives Pilot Program
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0145 (HB0145)
Title
Natural Resources - Fisheries Management - Regulations
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0437 (HB0618)
Title
Nonresident Recreational Fishing and Crabbing Licenses - Oyster Restoration Surcharge
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0466 (HB1155)
Title
Oyster Dredging - Waters North of the Chesapeake Bay Bridge and Kent Narrows Bridge
Sponsor
Senator Dyson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0591
Title
Chesapeake Bay Striped Bass Fishery - Allocation of Commercial Quota
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0929 (HB1153/CH0642)
Title
Commercial Fishing and Seafood Operations - Nuisance Actions - Exemption
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1111 (HB1551)
Title
Natural Resources - Fresh Oyster Shells - Purchase by County Oyster Committees
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0118 /CH0383 Task Force to Study the Impact of Ocean Acidification on State Waters Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 383
Environmental Matters
1/29/2014 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0145 (SB0145) Natural Resources - Fisheries Management - Regulations Delegate McIntosh 2 2 In the House - Referred to interim study by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
1/29/2014 - 2:00 PM
HB0154 /CH0587 Natural Resources - Sport Fisheries Advisory Commission - Membership Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 587
Environmental Matters
2/05/2014 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0618 (SB0437) Nonresident Recreational Fishing and Crabbing Licenses - Oyster Restoration Surcharge Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 2:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/12/2014 - 2:00 PM
HB0675 Recreational Hunting or Fishing License Applications - Disclosure of Information Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/12/2014 - 2:00 PM
HB0769 Recreational Hunting or Fishing License Applications - Disclosure of Information Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0913 Food Fish and Shellfish - Labeling and Identification Requirements (Maryland Seafood Authenticity and Enforcement Act) Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1104 Striped Bass Allocation - Individual Transferable Quotas - Prohibited Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
HB1148 /CH0446 Recreational Striped Bass Fishery - Study on Harvest Data Delegate Jacobs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 446
Environmental Matters
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1153 /CH0642 (SB0929) Commercial Fishing and Seafood Operations - Nuisance Actions - Exemption Delegate Jacobs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 642
Environmental Matters
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1155 (SB0466) Oyster Dredging - Waters North of the Chesapeake Bay Bridge and Kent Narrows Bridge Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1174 /CH0448 Recreational Hunting or Fishing Licenses - Denial, Suspension, and Required Disclosure Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 448
Environmental Matters
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1520 Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - Hunting and Sporting Goods Delegate Ready 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1551 (SB1111) Natural Resources - Fresh Oyster Shells - Purchase by County Oyster Committees Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0093 /CH0022 Natural Resources - Recreational Incentives Pilot Program Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 22
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/14/2014 - 3:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0145 (HB0145) Natural Resources - Fisheries Management - Regulations Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/28/2014 - 1:45 PM
SB0437 (HB0618) Nonresident Recreational Fishing and Crabbing Licenses - Oyster Restoration Surcharge Senator Frosh 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Pinsky)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0466 (HB1155) Oyster Dredging - Waters North of the Chesapeake Bay Bridge and Kent Narrows Bridge Senator Dyson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0591 Chesapeake Bay Striped Bass Fishery - Allocation of Commercial Quota Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0929 (HB1153/CH0642) Commercial Fishing and Seafood Operations - Nuisance Actions - Exemption Senator Hershey 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Environmental Matters
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
SB1111 (HB1551) Natural Resources - Fresh Oyster Shells - Purchase by County Oyster Committees Senator Colburn 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM