Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Flood Control

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0097 /CH0081
Title
Environment - Sediment Control and Stormwater Management Plans - Authority
Sponsor
Chair, Environmental Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0121 (SB0323)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - Culler Lake Stormwater Management
Sponsor
Delegate Clagett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0434 (SB0317)
Title
Frederick County - Stormwater Management - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - Exemption
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0508
Title
Environment - Local Stormwater Management Charges - State Property
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0613 /CH0624
Title
Sustainable Communities - Designation and Financing
Sponsor
Chair, Environmental Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0694
Title
Environment - Stormwater Management - Exemption from Watershed Protection and Restoration Program
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0706 /CH0384
Title
Natural Resources - Forest Preservation Act of 2013
Sponsor
Chair, Environmental Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1030 /CH0660
Title
Property Tax Credit - Urban Agricultural Property - Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1437 (SB1015)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - MTR Land Enhancement Project
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0317 (HB0434)
Title
Frederick County - Stormwater Management - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - Exemption
Sponsor
Senator Brinkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0323 (HB0121)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - Culler Lake Stormwater Management
Sponsor
Senator Brinkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1015 (HB1437)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - MTR Land Enhancement Project
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0097 /CH0081 Environment - Sediment Control and Stormwater Management Plans - Authority Chair, Environmental Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 81
Environmental Matters
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0121 (SB0323) Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - Culler Lake Stormwater Management Delegate Clagett 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/09/2013 - 10:00 AM
HB0434 (SB0317) Frederick County - Stormwater Management - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - Exemption Frederick County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
HB0508 Environment - Local Stormwater Management Charges - State Property Delegate Carr 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (34-12)
Environmental Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0613 /CH0624 Sustainable Communities - Designation and Financing Chair, Environmental Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 624
Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
Budget and Taxation
4/02/2013 - 1:30 PM
HB0694 Environment - Stormwater Management - Exemption from Watershed Protection and Restoration Program Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0706 /CH0384 Natural Resources - Forest Preservation Act of 2013 Chair, Environmental Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 384
Environmental Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1030 /CH0660 Property Tax Credit - Urban Agricultural Property - Definition Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 660
Ways and Means
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/02/2013 - 1:30 PM
HB1437 (SB1015) Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - MTR Land Enhancement Project Delegate Love 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/09/2013 - 12:00 PM
SB0317 (HB0434) Frederick County - Stormwater Management - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - Exemption Senator Brinkley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0323 (HB0121) Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - Culler Lake Stormwater Management Senator Brinkley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB1015 (HB1437) Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - MTR Land Enhancement Project Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 3:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2013 - 3:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM