Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Flood Control

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1155
Title
Environment - Soil Percolation Tests - Validity
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1350 /CH0628 (SB1006/CH0629)
Title
Sea Level Rise Inundation and Coastal Flooding - Construction, Adaptation, and Mitigation
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1381
Title
Environmental Violations - Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1390
Title
Land Use - Development Rights and Responsibilities Agreements - Enhanced Public Benefits
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1408
Title
Historic Ellicott City Workgroup on Preservation and Flooding
Sponsor
Delegate Flanagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1420
Title
Environment - Stormwater Management - Nontidal Floodwater
Sponsor
Delegate Flanagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1428
Title
Environment - Stormwater Management Infrastructure - Historic Districts
Sponsor
Delegate Flanagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1006 /CH0629 (HB1350/CH0628)
Title
Sea Level Rise Inundation and Coastal Flooding - Construction, Adaptation, and Mitigation
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1155 Environment - Soil Percolation Tests - Validity Delegate Fisher 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1350 /CH0628 (SB1006/CH0629) Sea Level Rise Inundation and Coastal Flooding - Construction, Adaptation, and Mitigation Delegate Stein 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 628
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1381 Environmental Violations - Reporting Requirements Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1390 Land Use - Development Rights and Responsibilities Agreements - Enhanced Public Benefits Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1408 Historic Ellicott City Workgroup on Preservation and Flooding Delegate Flanagan 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/05/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1420 Environment - Stormwater Management - Nontidal Floodwater Delegate Flanagan 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1428 Environment - Stormwater Management Infrastructure - Historic Districts Delegate Flanagan 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1006 /CH0629 (HB1350/CH0628) Sea Level Rise Inundation and Coastal Flooding - Construction, Adaptation, and Mitigation Senator Pinsky 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 629
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM