Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Food Stamps

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0356 /CH0718
Title
Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program Benefits - Grant Application
Sponsor
Delegate Pendergrass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0445 (SB0758/CH0696)
Title
Food Stamp Program - Minimum Benefit - State Supplement
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1449
Title
Food Stamp Program - Time Limit Waiver - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0328 (HB0220)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0546
Title
Transitional Supports for Ex-Offenders - Repeal of Restrictions
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0758 /CH0696 (HB0445)
Title
Food Stamp Program - Minimum Benefit - State Supplement
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0356 /CH0718 Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program Benefits - Grant Application Delegate Pendergrass 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 718
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0445 (SB0758/CH0696) Food Stamp Program - Minimum Benefit - State Supplement Delegate Lierman 2 2 Veto sustained (0-135)
Appropriations
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1449 Food Stamp Program - Time Limit Waiver - Prohibition Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0328 (HB0220) Criminal Procedure - Expungement Senator Conway 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0546 Transitional Supports for Ex-Offenders - Repeal of Restrictions Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0758 /CH0696 (HB0445) Food Stamp Program - Minimum Benefit - State Supplement Senator Madaleno 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 696
Finance
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM