Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Food Stamps

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0533
Title
Food Stamp Program - Time Limit Waiver - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0586 /CH0395 (SB0278/CH0396)
Title
Maryland Farms and Families Act
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0860 /CH0793 (SB0853/CH0792)
Title
Transitional Supports for Ex-Offenders - Repeal of Restrictions (Maryland Equal Access to Food Act of 2017)
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0278 /CH0396 (HB0586/CH0395)
Title
Maryland Farms and Families Act
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0853 /CH0792 (HB0860/CH0793)
Title
Transitional Supports for Ex-Offenders - Repeal of Restrictions (Maryland Equal Access to Food Act of 2017)
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0533 Food Stamp Program - Time Limit Waiver - Prohibition Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0586 /CH0395 (SB0278/CH0396) Maryland Farms and Families Act Delegate Hettleman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 395
Appropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0860 /CH0793 (SB0853/CH0792) Transitional Supports for Ex-Offenders - Repeal of Restrictions (Maryland Equal Access to Food Act of 2017) Delegate Lierman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 793
Appropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0278 /CH0396 (HB0586/CH0395) Maryland Farms and Families Act Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 396
Finance
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Appropriations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0853 /CH0792 (HB0860/CH0793) Transitional Supports for Ex-Offenders - Repeal of Restrictions (Maryland Equal Access to Food Act of 2017) Senator Madaleno 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 792
Finance
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM