Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Foreclosure

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0107 /CH0093
Title
Real Property - Residential Property Foreclosure Procedures
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0557 (SB0509/CH0276)
Title
Property Tax - In Rem Foreclosure and Sale - Vacant and Abandoned Property
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0593 (SB0485)
Title
Maryland Collection Agency Licensing Act - Definitions and Legislative Intent
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1209 /CH0730
Title
Property Tax - Collection of Unpaid Taxes and Tax Sales
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1266 /CH0732 (SB0754)
Title
National Capital Strategic Economic Development Program - Established
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1292 (SB0725)
Title
Tax Sales - Reimbursement for Expenses
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, D.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0509 /CH0276 (HB0557)
Title
Property Tax – In Rem Foreclosure and Sale – Vacant and Abandoned Property
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0512 /CH0522 (HB1318)
Title
Government Shutdowns - Employees - Protections
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0725 (HB1292)
Title
Tax Sales - Reimbursement for Expenses
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0754 (HB1266/CH0732)
Title
National Capital Strategic Economic Development Program - Established
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0107 /CH0093 Real Property - Residential Property Foreclosure Procedures Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 93
Environment and Transportation
2/05/2019 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB0557 (SB0509/CH0276) Property Tax - In Rem Foreclosure and Sale - Vacant and Abandoned Property Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0593 (SB0485) Maryland Collection Agency Licensing Act - Definitions and Legislative Intent Speaker 6 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Economic Matters
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB1209 /CH0730 Property Tax - Collection of Unpaid Taxes and Tax Sales Delegate Kaiser 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 730
Ways and Means
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1266 /CH0732 (SB0754) National Capital Strategic Economic Development Program - Established Delegate Washington 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 732
Appropriations
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Budget and Taxation
HB1292 (SB0725) Tax Sales - Reimbursement for Expenses Delegate Barnes, D. 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0509 /CH0276 (HB0557) Property Tax – In Rem Foreclosure and Sale – Vacant and Abandoned Property Senator Eckardt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 276
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0512 /CH0522 (HB1318) Government Shutdowns - Employees - Protections Senator Ellis 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 522
Finance
3/01/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Economic Matters
3/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0725 (HB1292) Tax Sales - Reimbursement for Expenses Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0754 (HB1266/CH0732) National Capital Strategic Economic Development Program - Established Senator Peters 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Appropriations and Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Appropriations
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:24 PM