Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Foreclosure

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0990 (SB0675)
Title
Baltimore County - Foreclosure Proceedings - Affidavit That Property Is Vacant or Unfit for Human Habitation
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1149 (SB1013)
Title
Department of Housing and Community Development - Social Housing Subprogram (Social Housing Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1181 /CH0440
Title
Property Tax - Tax Sales - Data Collection
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1313 /CH0457 (SB0787)
Title
Family Investment Program - Temporary Cash Assistance - Eligibility
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1519
Title
Homeowners Associations - Assessments - Lien Priority
Sponsor
Delegate Johnson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0675 (HB0990)
Title
Baltimore County - Foreclosure Proceedings - Affidavit That Property Is Vacant or Unfit for Human Habitation
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0787 (HB1313/CH0457)
Title
Family Investment Program - Temporary Cash Assistance - Eligibility
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1013 (HB1149)
Title
Department of Housing and Community Development - Social Housing Subprogram (Social Housing Act)
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0990 (SB0675) Baltimore County - Foreclosure Proceedings - Affidavit That Property Is Vacant or Unfit for Human Habitation Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1149 (SB1013) Department of Housing and Community Development - Social Housing Subprogram (Social Housing Act) Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1181 /CH0440 Property Tax - Tax Sales - Data Collection Delegate Kaiser 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 440
Ways and Means
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1313 /CH0457 (SB0787) Family Investment Program - Temporary Cash Assistance - Eligibility Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 457
Appropriations
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Budget and Taxation
HB1519 Homeowners Associations - Assessments - Lien Priority Delegate Johnson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0675 (HB0990) Baltimore County - Foreclosure Proceedings - Affidavit That Property Is Vacant or Unfit for Human Habitation Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0787 (HB1313/CH0457) Family Investment Program - Temporary Cash Assistance - Eligibility Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the House - First Reading Appropriations
Finance
3/06/2020 - 12:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Appropriations
SB1013 (HB1149) Department of Housing and Community Development - Social Housing Subprogram (Social Housing Act) Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/11/2020 4:18 PM