Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Foreign Ownership

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0351
Title
Corporations and Associations - Limited Liability Companies - Company Representative
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0651
Title
Personal Property Reports - Exemption and Affidavit
Sponsor
Delegate Turner
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0770 (SB0573/CH0367)
Title
Insurance - Standard Valuation Law and Reserve and Nonforfeiture Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0573 /CH0367 (HB0770)
Title
Insurance - Standard Valuation Law and Reserve and Nonforfeiture Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0351 Corporations and Associations - Limited Liability Companies - Company Representative Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0651 Personal Property Reports - Exemption and Affidavit Delegate Turner 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB0770 (SB0573/CH0367) Insurance - Standard Valuation Law and Reserve and Nonforfeiture Requirements Delegate Davis 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Health and Government Operations
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0573 /CH0367 (HB0770) Insurance - Standard Valuation Law and Reserve and Nonforfeiture Requirements Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 367
Finance
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM