Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Foreign Ownership

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1095 (SB0865)
Title
Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0041 /CH0100
Title
Nonstock Corporations – Consolidations, Mergers, and Conversions
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0523
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Foreign Government Employer-Sponsored Retirement Plans
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0865 (HB1095)
Title
Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1095 (SB0865) Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0041 /CH0100 Nonstock Corporations – Consolidations, Mergers, and Conversions Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 100
Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0523 Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Foreign Government Employer-Sponsored Retirement Plans Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0865 (HB1095) Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions Senator Feldman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM
Click to return on the top page