Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Foreign Ownership

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0076
Title
Small Business Fairness Act
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0137 /CH0289
Title
Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0743 /CH0403
Title
Election Law - Election Service Providers - Contract Clauses and Termination of Contract
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0076 Small Business Fairness Act Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/30/2019 - 2:00 PM
SB0137 /CH0289 Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 289
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2019 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0743 /CH0403 Election Law - Election Service Providers - Contract Clauses and Termination of Contract Senator Pinsky 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 403
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:24 PM