Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Forms

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0033 /CH0760
Title
Guardianship of Disabled Persons - Voluntary Admission to Mental Facility
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0335 (SB0338)
Title
State Personnel – Grievance Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0534
Title
Firearms - Right to Purchase, Own, Possess, and Carry - Medical Cannabis (Patients' Rights Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0749 (SB0551)
Title
Vehicle Laws – Dedicated Bus Lanes – Enforcement
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0776 (SB0492/CH0468)
Title
Procurement - Board of Public Works - Workforce Health Care Study
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0777 (SB0649)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0798 /CH0311
Title
Visual Impairments - Requirements for Student Vision Screening and Information (Atticus Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Kittleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0937
Title
Business Regulation - Household Goods Movers - Registration
Sponsor
Delegate Flanagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0989 (SB0877/CH0350)
Title
Promoting ext-Raordinary Innovation in Maryland's Economy (PRIME Act)
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1081 (SB1050)
Title
Civil Actions – Body Attachment – Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1346
Title
Gaming - Wagering on Sporting Events - Authorization and Implementation
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1513
Title
Commercial Law - Maryland Credit Repair Businesses Act
Sponsor
Delegate Fennell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1615 /CH0408 (SB1231)
Title
Human Services - Temporary Disability Assistance Program
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0245 /CH0712
Title
Procurement – Security Requirements – Forms
Sponsor
Senator Robinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0492 /CH0468 (HB0776)
Title
Procurement - Board of Public Works - Workforce Health Care Study
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0551 (HB0749)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Bus Lane Monitoring Cameras - Authorization
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0570 /CH0312
Title
Visual Impairments – Requirements for Student Vision Screening and Information (Atticus Act)
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0649 (HB0777)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0877 /CH0350 (HB0989)
Title
Promoting ext-Raordinary Innovation in Maryland's Economy (PRIME Act)
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0912 /CH0559 (HB1685/CH0558)
Title
Maryland Prenatal and Infant Care Coordination Services Grant Program Fund (Thrive by Three Fund)
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1050 (HB1081)
Title
Civil Actions - Body Attachment - Procedures
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1223 /CH0214 (HB1452/CH0213)
Title
Controlled Dangerous Substances Registration – Authorized Providers – Continuing Education
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1231 (HB1615/CH0408)
Title
Human Services - Temporary Disability Assistance Program
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0033 /CH0760 Guardianship of Disabled Persons - Voluntary Admission to Mental Facility Delegate Lam 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 760
Health and Government Operations
1/18/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0335 (SB0338) State Personnel – Grievance Procedures Delegate Haynes 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Appropriations
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0534 Firearms - Right to Purchase, Own, Possess, and Carry - Medical Cannabis (Patients' Rights Act) Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0749 (SB0551) Vehicle Laws – Dedicated Bus Lanes – Enforcement Delegate Lewis, R. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0776 (SB0492/CH0468) Procurement - Board of Public Works - Workforce Health Care Study Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Health and Government Operations
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB0777 (SB0649) Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0798 /CH0311 Visual Impairments - Requirements for Student Vision Screening and Information (Atticus Act) Delegate Kittleman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 311
Ways and Means
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0937 Business Regulation - Household Goods Movers - Registration Delegate Flanagan 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Economic Matters
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/04/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0989 (SB0877/CH0350) Promoting ext-Raordinary Innovation in Maryland's Economy (PRIME Act) Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1081 (SB1050) Civil Actions – Body Attachment – Procedures Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1346 Gaming - Wagering on Sporting Events - Authorization and Implementation Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1513 Commercial Law - Maryland Credit Repair Businesses Act Delegate Fennell 2 2 In the House - Referred to interim study by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1615 /CH0408 (SB1231) Human Services - Temporary Disability Assistance Program Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 408
Appropriations
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0245 /CH0712 Procurement – Security Requirements – Forms Senator Robinson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 712
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0492 /CH0468 (HB0776) Procurement - Board of Public Works - Workforce Health Care Study Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 468
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0551 (HB0749) Vehicle Laws - Bus Lane Monitoring Cameras - Authorization Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0570 /CH0312 Visual Impairments – Requirements for Student Vision Screening and Information (Atticus Act) Senator Bates 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 312
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0649 (HB0777) Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse Senator Kelley 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0877 /CH0350 (HB0989) Promoting ext-Raordinary Innovation in Maryland's Economy (PRIME Act) President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 350
Budget and Taxation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Ways and Means
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0912 /CH0559 (HB1685/CH0558) Maryland Prenatal and Infant Care Coordination Services Grant Program Fund (Thrive by Three Fund) Senator Ferguson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 559
Finance
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1050 (HB1081) Civil Actions - Body Attachment - Procedures Senator Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1223 /CH0214 (HB1452/CH0213) Controlled Dangerous Substances Registration – Authorized Providers – Continuing Education Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 214
Finance
3/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1231 (HB1615/CH0408) Human Services - Temporary Disability Assistance Program Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM