Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Foster Care

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0360 /CH0719 (SB0073)
Title
Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Foster Care Recipients
Sponsor
Delegate Jalisi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0400 /CH0263
Title
Higher Education - Tuition Waivers for Foster Care Recipients and Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - Modifications
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0511 /CH0058 (SB0252/CH0057)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Former Foster Care Adolescents - Dental Care
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0772 (SB0262)
Title
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0778
Title
Education - Students With Disabilities - Study of Parental Consent in the Individualized Education Program Process
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0976
Title
CINA, Guardianship, Adoption, Custody, and Visitation - Disability of Parent, Guardian, Custodian, or Party
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1106 /CH0001 (SB0921/CH0002)
Title
Clean Energy Jobs - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1162 /CH0079 (SB0785/CH0078)
Title
Foster Youth Summer Internship Program
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1288 /CH0306
Title
Higher Education - Tuition Waivers for Foster Care Recipients and Unaccompanied Homeless Youth
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1465
Title
Foster Care - Standards for Foster Parents
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0073 (HB0360/CH0719)
Title
Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Orphans and Foster Care Recipients
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0077 /CH0157
Title
Human Resources - Transition Planning for Foster Youth
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0094 /CH0344
Title
Workforce Development - Revisions
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0252 /CH0057 (HB0511/CH0058)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Former Foster Care Adolescents - Dental Care
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0262 (HB0772)
Title
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0704
Title
CINA Guardianship, Adoption, Custody, and Visitation - Blindness of Parent, Guardian, Custodian, or Party
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0765 /CH0423
Title
CINA, Guardianship, Adoption, Custody, and Visitation - Disability of Parent, Guardian, Custodian, or Party
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0785 /CH0078 (HB1162/CH0079)
Title
Foster Youth Summer Internship Program
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0921 /CH0002 (HB1106/CH0001)
Title
Clean Energy Jobs - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0950
Title
Education - Students With Disabilities - Study of Parental Consent in the Individualized Education Program Process
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1014
Title
Maryland Clean Energy Jobs Act of 2016
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0360 /CH0719 (SB0073) Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Foster Care Recipients Delegate Jalisi 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 719
Ways and Means
2/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0400 /CH0263 Higher Education - Tuition Waivers for Foster Care Recipients and Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - Modifications Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 263
Ways and Means
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0511 /CH0058 (SB0252/CH0057) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Former Foster Care Adolescents - Dental Care Delegate Cullison 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 58
Health and Government Operations
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0772 (SB0262) Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0778 Education - Students With Disabilities - Study of Parental Consent in the Individualized Education Program Process Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Ways and Means
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB0976 CINA, Guardianship, Adoption, Custody, and Visitation - Disability of Parent, Guardian, Custodian, or Party Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Judiciary
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB1106 /CH0001 (SB0921/CH0002) Clean Energy Jobs - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard Revisions Delegate Frick 2 2 Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 1 of 2017
Economic Matters
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1162 /CH0079 (SB0785/CH0078) Foster Youth Summer Internship Program Delegate Reznik 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 79
Appropriations
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1288 /CH0306 Higher Education - Tuition Waivers for Foster Care Recipients and Unaccompanied Homeless Youth Delegate Young, P. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 306
Appropriations
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1465 Foster Care - Standards for Foster Parents Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0073 (HB0360/CH0719) Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Orphans and Foster Care Recipients Senator Young 2 2 In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/20/2016 - 3:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0077 /CH0157 Human Resources - Transition Planning for Foster Youth Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 157
Judicial Proceedings
1/27/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0094 /CH0344 Workforce Development - Revisions Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 344
Finance
1/21/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0252 /CH0057 (HB0511/CH0058) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Former Foster Care Adolescents - Dental Care Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 57
Finance
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0262 (HB0772) Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Zirkin)
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0704 CINA Guardianship, Adoption, Custody, and Visitation - Blindness of Parent, Guardian, Custodian, or Party Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0765 /CH0423 CINA, Guardianship, Adoption, Custody, and Visitation - Disability of Parent, Guardian, Custodian, or Party Senator Raskin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 423
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0785 /CH0078 (HB1162/CH0079) Foster Youth Summer Internship Program Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 78
Finance
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0921 /CH0002 (HB1106/CH0001) Clean Energy Jobs - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard Revisions Senator Pugh 2 2 Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 2 of 2017
Finance
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0950 Education - Students With Disabilities - Study of Parental Consent in the Individualized Education Program Process Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1014 Maryland Clean Energy Jobs Act of 2016 Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; Withdrawn
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM