Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Franchises

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0264 /CH0480
Title
Task Force to Investigate the Challenges of and Opportunities for Minorities in Business
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0598
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Distribution and Sales Tax Revenues
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0632 /CH0622
Title
Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Luxury Restaurants and Farm Breweries - Licenses Ho. Co. 14-16
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0655 /CH0272
Title
Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class D Licenses Ho. Co. 7-16
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1404 /CH0034 (SB1130)
Title
Construction Education and Innovation - Establishment of Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1415
Title
Cable Service - Broadband Connection Requirement - Enforcement
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0033 (HB0642/CH0110)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1130 (HB1404/CH0034)
Title
Construction Education and Innovation - Establishment of Fund
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0264 /CH0480 Task Force to Investigate the Challenges of and Opportunities for Minorities in Business Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 480
Economic Matters
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0598 Alcoholic Beverages - Distribution and Sales Tax Revenues Delegate Frick 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB0632 /CH0622 Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Luxury Restaurants and Farm Breweries - Licenses Ho. Co. 14-16 Howard County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 622
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0655 /CH0272 Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class D Licenses Ho. Co. 7-16 Howard County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 272
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1404 /CH0034 (SB1130) Construction Education and Innovation - Establishment of Fund Delegate Brooks 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 34
Economic Matters
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1415 Cable Service - Broadband Connection Requirement - Enforcement Delegate Fisher 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0033 (HB0642/CH0110) Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses Senator Astle 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB1130 (HB1404/CH0034) Construction Education and Innovation - Establishment of Fund Senator Rosapepe 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Budget and Taxation
3/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM