Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Fraud -see also- Forgery

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0212 /CH0827 (SB0270/CH0828)
Title
Consumer Protection - Credit Report Security Freezes - Prohibition on Fees and Required Notices
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0321 /CH0361
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Audit Committee and Office of the Inspector General MC/PG 110-17
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0353 /CH0441
Title
Election Law - Change in Administrative Policy Affecting Voting Rights - Notice
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0424 (SB0304/CH0379)
Title
Taxpayer Protection Act
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0532 (SB1133)
Title
Election Law - Qualification of Voters - Proof of Identity
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0547
Title
Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act
Sponsor
Delegate Ciliberti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0603 /CH0345
Title
Vehicle Laws - Out-of-State Vehicles - Required Security
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0974 /CH0518 (SB0525)
Title
Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Carey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1022
Title
Health Occupations - Violations of the Maryland Dentistry Act - Penalties and Cease and Desist Orders
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1292
Title
State Board of Dental Examiners - Ownership, Management, or Operation of a Dental Practice
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1584 (SB1124)
Title
Maryland Dentistry Act - Scope of Practice and Penalties for Violations
Sponsor
Delegate Angel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0227
Title
Gaming - Video Lottery Operation Licensees - Confiscation of Fake Identification
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0270 /CH0828 (HB0212/CH0827)
Title
Consumer Protection - Credit Report Security Freezes - Prohibition on Fees and Required Notices
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0304 /CH0379 (HB0424)
Title
Taxpayer Protection Act
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0444
Title
Service Animals - Aggravated Cruelty and False Representation
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0525 (HB0974/CH0518)
Title
Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0530
Title
Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0699 (HB0467/CH0782)
Title
Providing Our Workers Education and Readiness (POWER) - Apprenticeship Act
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1092
Title
Public Assistance Fraud Prevention Act
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1124 (HB1584)
Title
Maryland Dentistry Act - Scope of Practice and Penalties for Violations
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1133 (HB0532)
Title
Election Law - Qualification of Voters - Proof of Identity
Sponsor
Senator Oaks
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0212 /CH0827 (SB0270/CH0828) Consumer Protection - Credit Report Security Freezes - Prohibition on Fees and Required Notices Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 827
Economic Matters
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0321 /CH0361 Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Audit Committee and Office of the Inspector General MC/PG 110-17 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 361
Environment and Transportation
3/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0353 /CH0441 Election Law - Change in Administrative Policy Affecting Voting Rights - Notice Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 441
Ways and Means
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0424 (SB0304/CH0379) Taxpayer Protection Act Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0532 (SB1133) Election Law - Qualification of Voters - Proof of Identity Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0547 Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act Delegate Ciliberti 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0603 /CH0345 Vehicle Laws - Out-of-State Vehicles - Required Security Delegate Parrott 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 345
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0974 /CH0518 (SB0525) Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Revisions Delegate Carey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 518
Economic Matters
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1022 Health Occupations - Violations of the Maryland Dentistry Act - Penalties and Cease and Desist Orders Delegate West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2017 - 12:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1292 State Board of Dental Examiners - Ownership, Management, or Operation of a Dental Practice Delegate West 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 12:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2017 - 12:00 PM
HB1584 (SB1124) Maryland Dentistry Act - Scope of Practice and Penalties for Violations Delegate Angel 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0227 Gaming - Video Lottery Operation Licensees - Confiscation of Fake Identification Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Budget and Taxation
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0270 /CH0828 (HB0212/CH0827) Consumer Protection - Credit Report Security Freezes - Prohibition on Fees and Required Notices Senator Lee 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 828
Finance
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0304 /CH0379 (HB0424) Taxpayer Protection Act President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 379
Budget and Taxation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0444 Service Animals - Aggravated Cruelty and False Representation Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0525 (HB0974/CH0518) Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Revisions Senator Lee 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0530 Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0699 (HB0467/CH0782) Providing Our Workers Education and Readiness (POWER) - Apprenticeship Act Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the House - Second Reading Passed
Finance
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Economic Matters
SB1092 Public Assistance Fraud Prevention Act Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1124 (HB1584) Maryland Dentistry Act - Scope of Practice and Penalties for Violations Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1133 (HB0532) Election Law - Qualification of Voters - Proof of Identity Senator Oaks 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; Withdrawn
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM