Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Fuel -see also- Coal

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0005
Title
State Board of Plumbing - Continuing Professional Competency - Master Plumbers and Master Natural Gas Fitters
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0292
Title
Natural Gas - Hydraulic Fracturing - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0347 (SB0365)
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Rate Reduction
Sponsor
Delegate Schuh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0567
Title
Procurement - State Vehicle Fleet - Biodiesel or Biofuel Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0865
Title
Natural Gas - Hydraulic Fracturing - Rural Residential Drinking Water Protection Act
Sponsor
Delegate Mizeur
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1030
Title
Public Health - Hydraulic Fracturing Chemicals - Information and Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1122 (SB0745)
Title
Shale Gas Drilling Safety Review Act of 2014
Sponsor
Delegate Mizeur
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0360
Title
Natural Gas - Hydraulic Fracturing - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0361
Title
Public Safety - Gas Pipeline Inspection Requirements - Best Available Technology
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0362
Title
Public Safety - Gas Pipeline Inspection Requirements - State Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0365 (HB0347)
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Rate Reduction
Sponsor
Senator Getty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0535
Title
Natural Gas Severance Tax and Impact Account
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0631
Title
Environment - Retail Service Stations - Setback Certification
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0678 /CH0325
Title
Maryland Oil Disaster Containment, Clean-Up and Contingency Fund and Oil Contaminated Site Environmental Cleanup Fund
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0745 (HB1122)
Title
Shale Gas Drilling Safety Review Act of 2014
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0005 State Board of Plumbing - Continuing Professional Competency - Master Plumbers and Master Natural Gas Fitters Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0292 Natural Gas - Hydraulic Fracturing - Prohibition Delegate Robinson, S. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0347 (SB0365) Sales and Use Tax - Rate Reduction Delegate Schuh 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0567 Procurement - State Vehicle Fleet - Biodiesel or Biofuel Requirements Delegate Bromwell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0865 Natural Gas - Hydraulic Fracturing - Rural Residential Drinking Water Protection Act Delegate Mizeur 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1030 Public Health - Hydraulic Fracturing Chemicals - Information and Fund Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1122 (SB0745) Shale Gas Drilling Safety Review Act of 2014 Delegate Mizeur 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0360 Natural Gas - Hydraulic Fracturing - Prohibition Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0361 Public Safety - Gas Pipeline Inspection Requirements - Best Available Technology Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0362 Public Safety - Gas Pipeline Inspection Requirements - State Penalties Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0365 (HB0347) Sales and Use Tax - Rate Reduction Senator Getty 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0535 Natural Gas Severance Tax and Impact Account Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0631 Environment - Retail Service Stations - Setback Certification Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0678 /CH0325 Maryland Oil Disaster Containment, Clean-Up and Contingency Fund and Oil Contaminated Site Environmental Cleanup Fund Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 325
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0745 (HB1122) Shale Gas Drilling Safety Review Act of 2014 Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM