Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Fuel Tax

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0055 /CH0238 (SB0054)
Title
Motor Fuel Tax - Aviation Gasoline - Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0552
Title
Transportation - Motor Fuel Tax and Highway User Revenue - Increased Local Share
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0627 /CH0522
Title
Motor Fuel Tax Refund - Demand Response Trips
Sponsor
Delegate Howard, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0911
Title
Motor Fuel Tax Rates - Consumer Price Index Adjustment - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Morgan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0054 (HB0055/CH0238)
Title
Motor Fuel Tax - Aviation Gasoline - Definition
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0055 /CH0238 (SB0054) Motor Fuel Tax - Aviation Gasoline - Definition Delegate Jameson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 238
Ways and Means
2/07/2017 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0552 Transportation - Motor Fuel Tax and Highway User Revenue - Increased Local Share Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0627 /CH0522 Motor Fuel Tax Refund - Demand Response Trips Delegate Howard, C. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 522
Ways and Means
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0911 Motor Fuel Tax Rates - Consumer Price Index Adjustment - Repeal Delegate Morgan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0054 (HB0055/CH0238) Motor Fuel Tax - Aviation Gasoline - Definition Senator Young 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0)
Budget and Taxation
1/18/2017 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM