Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Fuel Tax

Legislation
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0426
Title
21st Century Transportation Funding Act
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1052 /CH0012 (SB0703)
Title
Alcohol and Tobacco Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Miller
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1257 (SB0931)
Title
Maryland Transportation Public-Private Partnership Oversight Act
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0703 (HB1052/CH0012)
Title
Alcohol, Tobacco, and Motor Fuel Commission
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0931 (HB1257)
Title
Maryland Transportation Public-Private Partnership Oversight Act
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0426 21st Century Transportation Funding Act Delegate Korman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1052 /CH0012 (SB0703) Alcohol and Tobacco Commission Delegate Miller 4 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 12
Economic Matters
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1257 (SB0931) Maryland Transportation Public-Private Partnership Oversight Act Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0703 (HB1052/CH0012) Alcohol, Tobacco, and Motor Fuel Commission Senator Kramer 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0931 (HB1257) Maryland Transportation Public-Private Partnership Oversight Act Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:25 PM