Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Ethics (G2)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0124
Title
General Assembly - Disclosure of Financial Interests
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0129 /CH0085 (SB0407)
Title
Public Ethics - Chesapeake Bay Trust - Exemptions and Conflict of Interest Provisions
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0220 (SB0480/CH0062)
Title
Injured Workers' Insurance Fund Employees - Registration as Registered Lobbyists
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0270 /CH0094
Title
General Provisions Article
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0872 (SB0422)
Title
Public Ethics Laws - Meals - Regulated Lobbyist Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate George
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1179
Title
Public Ethics - Former Members of the General Assembly, Legislative Branch Officials, and Executive Branch Officials - Lobbying Restrictions
Sponsor
Delegate Bobo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1250
Title
Ethics - Lobbying Regulation - Associations Representing Counties or Municipal Corporations
Sponsor
Delegate Hucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1369 (SB0913)
Title
Ethics Law - Financial Disclosure Statement by Elected Local Official of Municipal Corporation - Confidential Information
Sponsor
Delegate Gilchrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0090 /CH0019
Title
Public Ethics - Regulated Lobbyists - Certification to Authorize Lobbying and Electronic Filing of Registration
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0091 /CH0020
Title
State Ethics Commission - Local Governments and School Boards - Compliance Enforcement
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0092 /CH0021
Title
Public Ethics - Regulated Lobbyists - Ethics Training Requirements
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0109 /CH0032
Title
Public Ethics - Financial Disclosure Statements - Electronic Filing
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0129 /CH0037
Title
Public Ethics - Officials and Regulated Lobbyists - Late-Filing Penalties
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0407 (HB0129/CH0085)
Title
Public Ethics - Chesapeake Bay Trust - Exemptions and Conflict of Interest Provisions
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0422 (HB0872)
Title
Public Ethics Laws - Meals - Regulated Lobbyist Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Kittleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0447
Title
Public Ethics - Members of the General Assembly - Presumption of a Conflict - Clients
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0480 /CH0062 (HB0220)
Title
Injured Workers' Insurance Fund Employees - Registration as Registered Lobbyists
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0913 (HB1369)
Title
Ethics Law - Financial Disclosure Statement by Elected Local Official of Municipal Corporation - Confidential Information
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1024
Title
Public Ethics Law - Prestige of Office - Prohibited Use
Sponsor
Senator Brinkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0124 General Assembly - Disclosure of Financial Interests Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0129 /CH0085 (SB0407) Public Ethics - Chesapeake Bay Trust - Exemptions and Conflict of Interest Provisions Delegate Robinson, S. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 85
Environmental Matters
1/29/2014 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0220 (SB0480/CH0062) Injured Workers' Insurance Fund Employees - Registration as Registered Lobbyists Delegate Jameson 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Finance
HB0270 /CH0094 General Provisions Article Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 94
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0872 (SB0422) Public Ethics Laws - Meals - Regulated Lobbyist Reporting Requirements Delegate George 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1179 Public Ethics - Former Members of the General Assembly, Legislative Branch Officials, and Executive Branch Officials - Lobbying Restrictions Delegate Bobo 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1250 Ethics - Lobbying Regulation - Associations Representing Counties or Municipal Corporations Delegate Hucker 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1369 (SB0913) Ethics Law - Financial Disclosure Statement by Elected Local Official of Municipal Corporation - Confidential Information Delegate Gilchrist 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0090 /CH0019 Public Ethics - Regulated Lobbyists - Certification to Authorize Lobbying and Electronic Filing of Registration Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 19
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/2014 - 2:45 PM
Environmental Matters
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0091 /CH0020 State Ethics Commission - Local Governments and School Boards - Compliance Enforcement Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 20
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/2014 - 2:45 PM
Environmental Matters
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0092 /CH0021 Public Ethics - Regulated Lobbyists - Ethics Training Requirements Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 21
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/2014 - 2:45 PM
Environmental Matters
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0109 /CH0032 Public Ethics - Financial Disclosure Statements - Electronic Filing Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 32
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/2014 - 2:45 PM
Environmental Matters
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0129 /CH0037 Public Ethics - Officials and Regulated Lobbyists - Late-Filing Penalties Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 37
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/2014 - 2:45 PM
Environmental Matters
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0407 (HB0129/CH0085) Public Ethics - Chesapeake Bay Trust - Exemptions and Conflict of Interest Provisions Senator Astle 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0422 (HB0872) Public Ethics Laws - Meals - Regulated Lobbyist Reporting Requirements Senator Kittleman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0447 Public Ethics - Members of the General Assembly - Presumption of a Conflict - Clients Senator Conway 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0480 /CH0062 (HB0220) Injured Workers' Insurance Fund Employees - Registration as Registered Lobbyists Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 62
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Economic Matters
SB0913 (HB1369) Ethics Law - Financial Disclosure Statement by Elected Local Official of Municipal Corporation - Confidential Information Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1024 Public Ethics Law - Prestige of Office - Prohibited Use Senator Brinkley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM