Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Ethics (G2)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0081 (SB0445)
Title
Ethics Commission, Commission on Judicial Disabilities, Judicial Ethics Committee, and Joint Ethics Committee - Duties
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0175 (SB0167)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Police Officers - Secondary Employment
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0234
Title
Ethics - Executive Branch - Lobbying by Former Officials
Sponsor
Delegate Tarlau
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0518
Title
Public Ethics - Former Legislators - Lobbying
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0584 (SB0283)
Title
Ethics Law - Financial Disclosure Statement by Elected Local Official of a Municipal Corporation - Confidential Information
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0738 /CH0271
Title
Jurisdiction of the State Ethics Commission and the Maryland State Board of Contract Appeals - Participation in Procurement
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1034
Title
Prince George's County - Public Ethics - Governing Bodies of Municipal Corporations Exercising Zoning Authority PG 420-15
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1272
Title
Lobbying - Legislative Unit Meals and Receptions - Publication of Report
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0167 (HB0175)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Police Officers - Secondary Employment
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Senators
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0283 (HB0584)
Title
Ethics Law - Financial Disclosure Statement by Elected Local Official of a Municipal Corporation - Confidential Information
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0343 /CH0160
Title
Public Ethics - Advisory Bodies - Advisory Opinions and Informal Advice
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0445 (HB0081)
Title
Ethics Commission, Judicial Ethics Committee, and Joint Ethics Committee - Duties
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0767 /CH0198
Title
Ethics Law - Statement by Person Providing Lobbyist Compensation and Making Campaign Contributions
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0081 (SB0445) Ethics Commission, Commission on Judicial Disabilities, Judicial Ethics Committee, and Joint Ethics Committee - Duties Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0175 (SB0167) Anne Arundel County - Police Officers - Secondary Employment Anne Arundel County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0234 Ethics - Executive Branch - Lobbying by Former Officials Delegate Tarlau 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0518 Public Ethics - Former Legislators - Lobbying Delegate Carr 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0584 (SB0283) Ethics Law - Financial Disclosure Statement by Elected Local Official of a Municipal Corporation - Confidential Information Delegate Healey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0738 /CH0271 Jurisdiction of the State Ethics Commission and the Maryland State Board of Contract Appeals - Participation in Procurement Delegate Krebs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 271
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1034 Prince George's County - Public Ethics - Governing Bodies of Municipal Corporations Exercising Zoning Authority PG 420-15 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB1272 Lobbying - Legislative Unit Meals and Receptions - Publication of Report Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0167 (HB0175) Anne Arundel County - Police Officers - Secondary Employment Anne Arundel County Senators 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0283 (HB0584) Ethics Law - Financial Disclosure Statement by Elected Local Official of a Municipal Corporation - Confidential Information Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0343 /CH0160 Public Ethics - Advisory Bodies - Advisory Opinions and Informal Advice Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 160
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0445 (HB0081) Ethics Commission, Judicial Ethics Committee, and Joint Ethics Committee - Duties Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0767 /CH0198 Ethics Law - Statement by Person Providing Lobbyist Compensation and Making Campaign Contributions Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 198
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM