Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Ethics (G2)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0227
Title
Prince George’s County – Ethics – Limitations on Applicant Campaign Contributions PG 404–19
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0326 /CH0163
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Office of the Inspector General - Technical Changes MC/PG 104-19
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0355 /CH0541
Title
Education – County Boards of Education – Disclosures and Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0617
Title
Public Ethics - Meals and Receptions - Governmental Unit That Employs an Individual Regulated Lobbyist
Sponsor
Delegate Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0673 /CH0375 (SB0921)
Title
Frederick County - Ethics and Campaign Activity - County Board and Commission Members and Board of License Commissioners
Sponsor
Delegate Pippy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0993 /CH0554 (SB0710/CH0555)
Title
Anne Arundel County – Ethics – Contributions and Participation in Development Applications
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1428 /CH0019
Title
University of Maryland Medical System Corporation – Board of Directors, Ethics, and Audits
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0079 /CH0149
Title
Public Ethics - Lobbyist Registration and Reporting - Mandatory Electronic Filing
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0619 /CH0018
Title
University of Maryland Medical System Corporation – Board of Directors, Ethics, and Audits
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0710 /CH0555 (HB0993/CH0554)
Title
Anne Arundel County – Ethics – Contributions and Participation in Development Applications
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0921 (HB0673/CH0375)
Title
Frederick County - Ethics and Campaign Activity - County Board and Commission Members and Board of License Commissioners
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0227 Prince George’s County – Ethics – Limitations on Applicant Campaign Contributions PG 404–19 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0326 /CH0163 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Office of the Inspector General - Technical Changes MC/PG 104-19 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 163
Environment and Transportation
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0355 /CH0541 Education – County Boards of Education – Disclosures and Requirements Delegate Patterson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 541
Ways and Means
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0617 Public Ethics - Meals and Receptions - Governmental Unit That Employs an Individual Regulated Lobbyist Delegate Miller 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0673 /CH0375 (SB0921) Frederick County - Ethics and Campaign Activity - County Board and Commission Members and Board of License Commissioners Delegate Pippy 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 375
Ways and Means
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0993 /CH0554 (SB0710/CH0555) Anne Arundel County – Ethics – Contributions and Participation in Development Applications Anne Arundel County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 554
Environment and Transportation
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1428 /CH0019 University of Maryland Medical System Corporation – Board of Directors, Ethics, and Audits Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 19
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0079 /CH0149 Public Ethics - Lobbyist Registration and Reporting - Mandatory Electronic Filing Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 149
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/10/2019 - 2:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0619 /CH0018 University of Maryland Medical System Corporation – Board of Directors, Ethics, and Audits Senator Carter 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 18
Finance
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0710 /CH0555 (HB0993/CH0554) Anne Arundel County – Ethics – Contributions and Participation in Development Applications Anne Arundel County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 555
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0921 (HB0673/CH0375) Frederick County - Ethics and Campaign Activity - County Board and Commission Members and Board of License Commissioners Senator Hough 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/02/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:15 PM