Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

General Services, Department of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0048 /CH0605 (SB1066/CH0343)
Title
Minority Business Enterprises - Not-for-Profit Entities
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0102 /CH0425 (SB0127)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0560 /CH0005 (SB0538)
Title
Public-Private Partnerships
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0605
Title
Public-Private Partnerships
Sponsor
Delegate Clagett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1337 /CH0530 (SB0702/CH0529)
Title
Maryland Public Art Initiative Program - Selection of Art for Capital Projects
Sponsor
Delegate Griffith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0127 (HB0102/CH0425)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0538 (HB0560/CH0005)
Title
Public-Private Partnerships
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0702 /CH0529 (HB1337/CH0530)
Title
Maryland Public Art Initiative Program - Selection of Art for Capital Projects
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1066 /CH0343 (HB0048/CH0605)
Title
Minority Business Enterprises - Not-for-Profit Entities
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0048 /CH0605 (SB1066/CH0343) Minority Business Enterprises - Not-for-Profit Entities Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 605
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0102 /CH0425 (SB0127) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013 Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 425
Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0560 /CH0005 (SB0538) Public-Private Partnerships Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 5
Environmental Matters
2/15/2013 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0605 Public-Private Partnerships Delegate Clagett 2 2 In the House - Hearing cancelled (Environmental Matters)
Environmental Matters
Appropriations
HB1337 /CH0530 (SB0702/CH0529) Maryland Public Art Initiative Program - Selection of Art for Capital Projects Delegate Griffith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 530
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0127 (HB0102/CH0425) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0538 (HB0560/CH0005) Public-Private Partnerships President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 PM
SB0702 /CH0529 (HB1337/CH0530) Maryland Public Art Initiative Program - Selection of Art for Capital Projects Senator Madaleno 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 529
Finance
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB1066 /CH0343 (HB0048/CH0605) Minority Business Enterprises - Not-for-Profit Entities Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 343
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM