Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

General Services, Department of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0003 /CH0627 (SB0138)
Title
Environment - U.S. Climate Alliance - Membership
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0138 (SB1080)
Title
Assembly Areas - State-Funded Construction or Renovation - Assistive Listening System Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Knotts
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0141 (SB0782)
Title
State Finance and Procurement - Public Buildings - Diaper-Changing Facilities in Restrooms
Sponsor
Delegate Knotts
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0224
Title
Procurement - Small Businesses and Minority Businesses - Qualification and Certification
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0597 (SB0417)
Title
Commission on African American Patriots in the American Revolutionary War
Sponsor
Delegate Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0776 (SB0492/CH0468)
Title
Procurement - Board of Public Works - Workforce Health Care Study
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0986 (SB1009)
Title
Department of General Services - Bird-Safe Building Standards (Maryland Bird-Safe Buildings Act of 2018)
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1556
Title
Public-Private Partnerships - Public Notice of Solicitations and Approval of Agreements
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1610
Title
State–Occupied Buildings – Child Care Centers – Requirements and Renovations
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1783 /CH0014 (SB1243)
Title
21st Century School Facilities Act
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0138 (HB0003/CH0627)
Title
Environment - U.S. Climate Alliance - Membership
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0414 /CH0455
Title
Governor’s Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs – Small Business Resources and Data Collection
Sponsor
Senator Robinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0417 (HB0597)
Title
Commission on African American Patriots in the American Revolutionary War
Sponsor
Senator Robinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0420
Title
Commission to Study Compliance by State Gaming Facility Licensees With the State Minority Business Enterprise Program
Sponsor
Senator Robinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0492 /CH0468 (HB0776)
Title
Procurement - Board of Public Works - Workforce Health Care Study
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0782 (HB0141)
Title
State Finance and Procurement - Public Buildings - Diaper-Changing Facilities in Restrooms
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1009 (HB0986)
Title
Department of General Services – Bird–Safe Building Standards (Maryland Bird–Safe Buildings Act of 2018)
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1080 (HB0138)
Title
Assembly Areas - State-Funded Construction or Renovation - Assistive Listening System Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1121
Title
Procurement - Small Businesses and Minority Businesses - Qualification and Certification
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1149
Title
Appropriations and Public–Private Partnerships – Transit Lines – Three–Station Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1243 (HB1783/CH0014)
Title
21st Century School Facilities Act
Sponsor
Senator DeGrange
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0003 /CH0627 (SB0138) Environment - U.S. Climate Alliance - Membership Delegate Stein 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 627
Environment and Transportation
1/24/2018 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0138 (SB1080) Assembly Areas - State-Funded Construction or Renovation - Assistive Listening System Requirement Delegate Knotts 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
HB0141 (SB0782) State Finance and Procurement - Public Buildings - Diaper-Changing Facilities in Restrooms Delegate Knotts 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0224 Procurement - Small Businesses and Minority Businesses - Qualification and Certification Delegate Lewis, J. 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
1/31/2018 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0597 (SB0417) Commission on African American Patriots in the American Revolutionary War Delegate Patterson 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0776 (SB0492/CH0468) Procurement - Board of Public Works - Workforce Health Care Study Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Health and Government Operations
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB0986 (SB1009) Department of General Services - Bird-Safe Building Standards (Maryland Bird-Safe Buildings Act of 2018) Delegate Lam 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB1556 Public-Private Partnerships - Public Notice of Solicitations and Approval of Agreements Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1610 State–Occupied Buildings – Child Care Centers – Requirements and Renovations Delegate Queen 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1783 /CH0014 (SB1243) 21st Century School Facilities Act Delegate Jones 2 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 14
Appropriations
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0138 (HB0003/CH0627) Environment - U.S. Climate Alliance - Membership Senator Conway 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/25/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0414 /CH0455 Governor’s Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs – Small Business Resources and Data Collection Senator Robinson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 455
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0417 (HB0597) Commission on African American Patriots in the American Revolutionary War Senator Robinson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2018 - 2:00 PM
SB0420 Commission to Study Compliance by State Gaming Facility Licensees With the State Minority Business Enterprise Program Senator Robinson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0492 /CH0468 (HB0776) Procurement - Board of Public Works - Workforce Health Care Study Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 468
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0782 (HB0141) State Finance and Procurement - Public Buildings - Diaper-Changing Facilities in Restrooms Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1009 (HB0986) Department of General Services – Bird–Safe Building Standards (Maryland Bird–Safe Buildings Act of 2018) Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1080 (HB0138) Assembly Areas - State-Funded Construction or Renovation - Assistive Listening System Requirement Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB1121 Procurement - Small Businesses and Minority Businesses - Qualification and Certification Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1149 Appropriations and Public–Private Partnerships – Transit Lines – Three–Station Requirement Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1243 (HB1783/CH0014) 21st Century School Facilities Act Senator DeGrange 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:45 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/15/2018 - 1:45 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM