Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Good Samaritan

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0232 /CH0412 (SB0605/CH0411)
Title
Athletic Trainers - Evaluation and Treatment Protocols - Approval
Sponsor
Delegate Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0404 (SB0418)
Title
Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer End-of-Life Option Act
Sponsor
Delegate Pendergrass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0838
Title
Civil Immunity - Emergency Care for Drug Overdose - Protocols
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1418 (SB0898)
Title
Public Health - Emergency Use Auto-Injectable Epinephrine Program for Food Service Facilities
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1481 (SB0723)
Title
Civil Actions - Immunity From Liability - Entering a Property to Provide Emergency Assistance or Medical Care
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0052
Title
Immunity From Civil Liability - Forcible Entry Into Motor Vehicle
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0270
Title
Courts - Forcible Entry Into Vehicle to Assist Trapped Animal - Immunity
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0418 (HB0404)
Title
Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer End-of-Life Option Act
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0605 /CH0411 (HB0232/CH0412)
Title
Athletic Trainers - Evaluation and Treatment Protocols - Approval
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0723 (HB1481)
Title
Civil Actions - Immunity From Liability - Entering a Property to Provide Emergency Assistance or Medical Care
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0898 (HB1418)
Title
Public Health - Auto-Injectable Epinephrine - Certification for Emergency Administration
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0232 /CH0412 (SB0605/CH0411) Athletic Trainers - Evaluation and Treatment Protocols - Approval Delegate Hayes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 412
Health and Government Operations
2/10/2016 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0404 (SB0418) Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer End-of-Life Option Act Delegate Pendergrass 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Health and Government Operations
2/19/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB0838 Civil Immunity - Emergency Care for Drug Overdose - Protocols Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1418 (SB0898) Public Health - Emergency Use Auto-Injectable Epinephrine Program for Food Service Facilities Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1481 (SB0723) Civil Actions - Immunity From Liability - Entering a Property to Provide Emergency Assistance or Medical Care Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0052 Immunity From Civil Liability - Forcible Entry Into Motor Vehicle Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
1/19/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0270 Courts - Forcible Entry Into Vehicle to Assist Trapped Animal - Immunity Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0418 (HB0404) Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer End-of-Life Option Act Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0605 /CH0411 (HB0232/CH0412) Athletic Trainers - Evaluation and Treatment Protocols - Approval Senator Bates 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 411
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0723 (HB1481) Civil Actions - Immunity From Liability - Entering a Property to Provide Emergency Assistance or Medical Care Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0898 (HB1418) Public Health - Auto-Injectable Epinephrine - Certification for Emergency Administration Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM