Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Good Samaritan

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0370 (SB0354)
Title
Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer End-of-Life Option Act
Sponsor
Delegate Pendergrass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0612
Title
Criminal Law - Distribution of Heroin or Fentanyl Resulting in Death
Sponsor
Delegate Impallaria
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0687 (SB0539/CH0569)
Title
Criminal Law - Distribution of Opioids Resulting in Death
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1082 /CH0573 (SB1060/CH0574)
Title
Heroin and Opioid Education and Community Action Act of 2017 (Start Talking Maryland Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1321
Title
Child Protection - Reporting - Threat of Harm
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1379
Title
Courts - Criminal and Civil Immunity - Prescribing, Dispensing, and Administering Opioid Antagonists
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1436
Title
Civil Actions - Duty to Render Assistance
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1549
Title
Public Health - Drug Overdose Prevention Programs - Revisions
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0354 (HB0370)
Title
Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer End-of-Life Option Act
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0443
Title
Courts - Forcible Entry Into Vehicle to Assist Trapped Animal - Immunity
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0539 /CH0569 (HB0687)
Title
Criminal Law - Distribution of Controlled Dangerous Substances - Fentanyl
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1060 /CH0574 (HB1082/CH0573)
Title
Heroin and Opioid Education and Community Action Act of 2017 (Start Talking Maryland Act)
Sponsor
Senator Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0370 (SB0354) Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer End-of-Life Option Act Delegate Pendergrass 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Health and Government Operations
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB0612 Criminal Law - Distribution of Heroin or Fentanyl Resulting in Death Delegate Impallaria 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0687 (SB0539/CH0569) Criminal Law - Distribution of Opioids Resulting in Death Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1082 /CH0573 (SB1060/CH0574) Heroin and Opioid Education and Community Action Act of 2017 (Start Talking Maryland Act) Delegate Bromwell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 573
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1321 Child Protection - Reporting - Threat of Harm Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1379 Courts - Criminal and Civil Immunity - Prescribing, Dispensing, and Administering Opioid Antagonists Delegate Frick 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1436 Civil Actions - Duty to Render Assistance Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1549 Public Health - Drug Overdose Prevention Programs - Revisions Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0354 (HB0370) Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer End-of-Life Option Act Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0443 Courts - Forcible Entry Into Vehicle to Assist Trapped Animal - Immunity Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0539 /CH0569 (HB0687) Criminal Law - Distribution of Controlled Dangerous Substances - Fentanyl President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 569
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1060 /CH0574 (HB1082/CH0573) Heroin and Opioid Education and Community Action Act of 2017 (Start Talking Maryland Act) Senator Miller 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 574
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/06/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM