Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Gratuities

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0187
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Payment of Wages
Sponsor
Delegate Braveboy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0295 /CH0262 (SB0331)
Title
Maryland Minimum Wage Act of 2014
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0347 (SB0365)
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Rate Reduction
Sponsor
Delegate Schuh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0387 (SB0059)
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Payroll Taxes on Employee Tips
Sponsor
Delegate Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0059 (HB0387)
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Payroll Taxes on Employee Tips
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0331 (HB0295/CH0262)
Title
Maryland Minimum Wage Act of 2014
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0365 (HB0347)
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Rate Reduction
Sponsor
Senator Getty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0371
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Payment of Wages
Sponsor
Senator Currie
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0187 Labor and Employment - Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Payment of Wages Delegate Braveboy 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0295 /CH0262 (SB0331) Maryland Minimum Wage Act of 2014 Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 262
Economic Matters
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0347 (SB0365) Sales and Use Tax - Rate Reduction Delegate Schuh 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0387 (SB0059) Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Payroll Taxes on Employee Tips Delegate Conway 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0059 (HB0387) Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Payroll Taxes on Employee Tips Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/29 at 1:45 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/29/2014 - 1:45 PM
SB0331 (HB0295/CH0262) Maryland Minimum Wage Act of 2014 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 12:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
2/17/2014 - 12:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0365 (HB0347) Sales and Use Tax - Rate Reduction Senator Getty 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0371 Labor and Employment - Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Payment of Wages Senator Currie 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 12:00 p.m.
Finance
2/17/2014 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM