Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Group Homes -see also- Assisted Living

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0162 (SB0172/CH0464)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2014
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0273 (SB0262)
Title
Mental Health and Substance Use Disorder Safety Net Act of 2014
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0532 (SB0432)
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Database of Direct Access Employees - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0972
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2011 - Howard County - The Arc of Howard County - Graeloch Home Renovation
Sponsor
Delegate Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1272
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Birth Registrations - Notice of Placement of Security Freezes
Sponsor
Delegate Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1380 (SB1014)
Title
Developmental Disabilities - Residential Programs - Reimbursement for Visitation Absence Days
Sponsor
Delegate Hubbard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1511
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Adult Dependent Care Providers - Maryland Background Check Program
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0172 /CH0464 (HB0162)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2014
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0262 (HB0273)
Title
Mental Health and Substance Use Disorder Safety Net Act of 2014
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0432 (HB0532)
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Plan for Creation and Implementation of a Database of Direct Access Employees
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1014 (HB1380)
Title
Developmental Disabilities - Residential Programs - Reimbursement for Visitation Absence Days
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0162 (SB0172/CH0464) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2014 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0273 (SB0262) Mental Health and Substance Use Disorder Safety Net Act of 2014 Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0532 (SB0432) Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Database of Direct Access Employees - Establishment Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0972 Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2011 - Howard County - The Arc of Howard County - Graeloch Home Renovation Delegate Guzzone 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1272 Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Birth Registrations - Notice of Placement of Security Freezes Delegate Lee 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1380 (SB1014) Developmental Disabilities - Residential Programs - Reimbursement for Visitation Absence Days Delegate Hubbard 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1511 Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Adult Dependent Care Providers - Maryland Background Check Program Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2014 - 12:30 PM
SB0172 /CH0464 (HB0162) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2014 President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 464
Budget and Taxation
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0262 (HB0273) Mental Health and Substance Use Disorder Safety Net Act of 2014 Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0432 (HB0532) Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Plan for Creation and Implementation of a Database of Direct Access Employees Senator Pugh 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Finance
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1014 (HB1380) Developmental Disabilities - Residential Programs - Reimbursement for Visitation Absence Days Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM