Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Harassment -see also- Threats

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0480
Title
Criminal Law - Harassment - Misuse of Interactive Computer Service
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0669 /CH0197
Title
Public Schools - Boards of Education - Anonymous Two-Way Electronic Tip Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0803 (SB0900)
Title
Domestic Violence - Education and Definition of Abuse
Sponsor
Delegate Angel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1037 /CH0598 (SB0166)
Title
Baltimore City - Civilian Review Board
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1272
Title
Prince George's County - Domestic Violence - Definition of Abuse PG 314-17
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1659
Title
Employment Discrimination - Sexual Harassment - Definition of Employer
Sponsor
Delegate Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1661 (SB1191/CH0732)
Title
Schools and Child Care Centers - State Grant Program - Security Upgrades for Facilities at Risk of Hate Crimes or Attacks
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0166 (HB1037/CH0598)
Title
Baltimore City - Civilian Review Board
Sponsor
Senator Conway
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0900 (HB0803)
Title
Domestic Violence - Education and Definition of Abuse
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1191 /CH0732 (HB1661)
Title
Schools and Child Care Centers - State Grant Program - Security Upgrades for Facilities at Risk of Hate Crimes or Attacks
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0480 Criminal Law - Harassment - Misuse of Interactive Computer Service Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0669 /CH0197 Public Schools - Boards of Education - Anonymous Two-Way Electronic Tip Programs Delegate Arentz 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 197
Ways and Means
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0803 (SB0900) Domestic Violence - Education and Definition of Abuse Delegate Angel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1037 /CH0598 (SB0166) Baltimore City - Civilian Review Board Delegate Anderson 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 598
Judiciary
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1272 Prince George's County - Domestic Violence - Definition of Abuse PG 314-17 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1659 Employment Discrimination - Sexual Harassment - Definition of Employer Delegate Simonaire 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1661 (SB1191/CH0732) Schools and Child Care Centers - State Grant Program - Security Upgrades for Facilities at Risk of Hate Crimes or Attacks Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Veto sustained (0-140)
Ways and Means
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0166 (HB1037/CH0598) Baltimore City - Civilian Review Board Senator Conway 4 2 Veto sustained (0-44)
Judicial Proceedings
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0900 (HB0803) Domestic Violence - Education and Definition of Abuse Senator Peters 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB1191 /CH0732 (HB1661) Schools and Child Care Centers - State Grant Program - Security Upgrades for Facilities at Risk of Hate Crimes or Attacks Senator Manno 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 732
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM