Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Harford County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0340
Title
State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations ("Slots" for Homeless Veterans Act)
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0401 /CH0175 (SB0923/CH0176)
Title
Harford County - Hunting - Deer Management Permits
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0460 /CH0469
Title
Harford County Board of Education - Elected Members - Start Date of Term
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0467 (SB0389)
Title
Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Low Speed Electric Vehicles - City of Havre de Grace
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0507
Title
Baltimore County and Harford County – Motorcycles – Sunday Sales
Sponsor
Baltimore County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0769
Title
Harford County Parishioner Protection Pilot Program
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0803 /CH0177
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Annual Financial Audit
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0805 /CH0696
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Continuing Care Facility for the Aged License
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0936
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Multiple Licensing Plans
Sponsor
Delegate Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1149 /CH0179
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Filing Period for Renewal Applications
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1347 /CH0737
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt – Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1394
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Seasonal Closing
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1408
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Applications for Class B and Class BNR Licenses
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0124 /CH0466
Title
Anne Arundel County and Harford County - Court Dog and Child Witness Pilot Program - Extension
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0389 (HB0467)
Title
Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Low Speed Electric Vehicles - City of Havre de Grace
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0923 /CH0176 (HB0401/CH0175)
Title
Harford County - Hunting - Deer Management Permits
Sponsor
Senator Gallion
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0960 /CH0769
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Seasonal Closing
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0340 State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations ("Slots" for Homeless Veterans Act) Delegate McKay 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0401 /CH0175 (SB0923/CH0176) Harford County - Hunting - Deer Management Permits Harford County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 175
Environment and Transportation
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0460 /CH0469 Harford County Board of Education - Elected Members - Start Date of Term Harford County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 469
Ways and Means
2/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0467 (SB0389) Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Low Speed Electric Vehicles - City of Havre de Grace Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0507 Baltimore County and Harford County – Motorcycles – Sunday Sales Baltimore County Delegation 4 2 In the House - House Requests Senate Recede
Economic Matters
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0769 Harford County Parishioner Protection Pilot Program Harford County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/25/2019 - 10:00 AM
HB0803 /CH0177 Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Annual Financial Audit Harford County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 177
Economic Matters
2/18/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0805 /CH0696 Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Continuing Care Facility for the Aged License Harford County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 696
Economic Matters
2/18/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0936 Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Multiple Licensing Plans Delegate Cassilly 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/18/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1149 /CH0179 Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Filing Period for Renewal Applications Harford County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 179
Economic Matters
2/18/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1347 /CH0737 Prior Authorizations of State Debt – Alterations Delegate Jones 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 737
Appropriations
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2019 - 12:45 PM
HB1394 Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Seasonal Closing Harford County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1408 Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Applications for Class B and Class BNR Licenses Harford County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0124 /CH0466 Anne Arundel County and Harford County - Court Dog and Child Witness Pilot Program - Extension Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 466
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2019 - 2:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0389 (HB0467) Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Low Speed Electric Vehicles - City of Havre de Grace Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2019 - 12:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0923 /CH0176 (HB0401/CH0175) Harford County - Hunting - Deer Management Permits Senator Gallion 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 176
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2019 - 10:00 AM
Environment and Transportation
SB0960 /CH0769 Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Seasonal Closing Senator Jennings 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 769
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:25 PM