Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Health Benefit Exchange

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0730 /CH0227
Title
Health Insurance - Coverage for Diabetes Test Strips - Prohibition on Deductible, Copayment, and Coinsurance
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0910
Title
Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Application for State Innovation Waiver
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0983 /CH0765
Title
Health Insurance - Health Care Services Delivered Through Telehealth - Coverage
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1121 (SB1054)
Title
Health Insurance - Freedom of Choice of Pharmacy Act
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1212
Title
Health Insurance - Prior Authorization for Opioid Antagonists - Authorization
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1223
Title
Public Health - State Funding for Abortions - Prohibition and Exceptions
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1054 (HB1121)
Title
Health Insurance - Freedom of Choice of Pharmacy Act
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0730 /CH0227 Health Insurance - Coverage for Diabetes Test Strips - Prohibition on Deductible, Copayment, and Coinsurance Delegate Hill 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 227
Health and Government Operations
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0910 Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Application for State Innovation Waiver Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0983 /CH0765 Health Insurance - Health Care Services Delivered Through Telehealth - Coverage Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 765
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2017 - 12:00 PM
Finance
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1121 (SB1054) Health Insurance - Freedom of Choice of Pharmacy Act Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1212 Health Insurance - Prior Authorization for Opioid Antagonists - Authorization Delegate Frick 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2017 - 12:00 PM
Finance
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1223 Public Health - State Funding for Abortions - Prohibition and Exceptions Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1054 (HB1121) Health Insurance - Freedom of Choice of Pharmacy Act Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM