Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Health Care Commission

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0228 /CH0159 (SB0274)
Title
Maryland Health Progress Act of 2013
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0581 /CH0379
Title
Hospitals - Establishment of Palliative Care Pilot Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Hubbard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0826
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission - Personalized Medicine - Study
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0934 /CH0320 (SB0776/CH0319)
Title
Telemedicine Task Force - Maryland Health Care Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1015 (SB0746)
Title
Health Insurance - Step Therapy or Fail-First Protocol
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0274 (HB0228/CH0159)
Title
Maryland Health Progress Act of 2013
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0746 (HB1015)
Title
Health Insurance - Step Therapy or Fail-First Protocol
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0776 /CH0319 (HB0934/CH0320)
Title
Telemedicine Task Force - Maryland Health Care Commission
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0977 (HB1501)
Title
Task Force to Evaluate Regional Health Delivery and Health Planning in Rural Areas
Sponsor
Senator Pipkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0228 /CH0159 (SB0274) Maryland Health Progress Act of 2013 Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 159
Health and Government Operations
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0581 /CH0379 Hospitals - Establishment of Palliative Care Pilot Programs Delegate Hubbard 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 379
Health and Government Operations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0826 Maryland Health Care Commission - Personalized Medicine - Study Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0934 /CH0320 (SB0776/CH0319) Telemedicine Task Force - Maryland Health Care Commission Delegate Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 320
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1015 (SB0746) Health Insurance - Step Therapy or Fail-First Protocol Delegate Bromwell 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0274 (HB0228/CH0159) Maryland Health Progress Act of 2013 President 3 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0746 (HB1015) Health Insurance - Step Therapy or Fail-First Protocol Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0776 /CH0319 (HB0934/CH0320) Telemedicine Task Force - Maryland Health Care Commission Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 319
Finance
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0977 (HB1501) Task Force to Evaluate Regional Health Delivery and Health Planning in Rural Areas Senator Pipkin 2 2 In the House - Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Finance
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM