Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Health Care Commission

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0602 (SB0320/CH0024)
Title
University of Maryland School of Medicine - Workgroup to Study Issues Related to Uterine Fibroids
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0650 (SB0281)
Title
Blue Ribbon Commission to Study Maryland's Behavioral Health System
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0683
Title
Health Occupations - Magnetic Resonance Imaging Services and Computed Tomography Scan Services - Patient Referrals
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0759 /CH0274
Title
Health Insurance - Small Employer Health Benefit Plan Premium Subsidy Program - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1256
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission - Certificates of Need - Application of Bed Need Projections
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0281 (HB0650)
Title
Blue Ribbon Commission to Study Maryland's Behavioral Health System
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0320 /CH0024 (HB0602)
Title
University of Maryland School of Medicine - Workgroup to Study Issues Related to Uterine Fibroids
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0602 (SB0320/CH0024) University of Maryland School of Medicine - Workgroup to Study Issues Related to Uterine Fibroids Delegate Glenn 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Health and Government Operations
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0650 (SB0281) Blue Ribbon Commission to Study Maryland's Behavioral Health System Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0683 Health Occupations - Magnetic Resonance Imaging Services and Computed Tomography Scan Services - Patient Referrals Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0759 /CH0274 Health Insurance - Small Employer Health Benefit Plan Premium Subsidy Program - Repeal Delegate Bromwell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 274
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1256 Maryland Health Care Commission - Certificates of Need - Application of Bed Need Projections Delegate Bromwell 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0281 (HB0650) Blue Ribbon Commission to Study Maryland's Behavioral Health System Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0320 /CH0024 (HB0602) University of Maryland School of Medicine - Workgroup to Study Issues Related to Uterine Fibroids Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 24
Finance
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM