Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Health Care Commission

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0115 /CH0435 (SB0013/CH0436)
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission - Electronic Prescription Records System - Assessment and Report
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0716 /CH0082 (SB0266/CH0083)
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission - Mortality Rates of African American Infants and Infants in Rural Areas - Study
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1197 (SB0706)
Title
Telehealth - Coverage for Breast Cancer Services
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1416
Title
Drugs and Devices - Electronic Prescriptions - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Saab
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1519 (SB1024)
Title
Self-Referrals - Oncology Group Practices - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1540
Title
Health Care Facilities - Closing or Partial Closing - Public Notice
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1574
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission - Health Record and Payment Integration Program Advisory Committee
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0013 /CH0436 (HB0115/CH0435)
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission – Electronic Prescription Records System – Assessment and Report
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0017 /CH0657
Title
Health Information Exchanges - Definitions and Regulations
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0108 /CH0661
Title
Regulation of Health Care Programs, Medical Laboratories, Tissue Banks, and Health Care Facilities - Revisions
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0266 /CH0083 (HB0716/CH0082)
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission – Mortality Rates of African American Infants and Infants in Rural Areas – Study
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0682 /CH0605
Title
Emergency Medical Services Providers – Coverage and Reimbursement of Services – Reports and Plan
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0706 (HB1197)
Title
Telehealth – Coverage for Breast Cancer Services
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0896 /CH0452
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission – Health Record and Payment Integration Program Advisory Committee
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1024 (HB1519)
Title
Self-Referrals - Oncology Group Practices - Exemption
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0115 /CH0435 (SB0013/CH0436) Maryland Health Care Commission - Electronic Prescription Records System - Assessment and Report Delegate Morhaim 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 435
Health and Government Operations
1/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0716 /CH0082 (SB0266/CH0083) Maryland Health Care Commission - Mortality Rates of African American Infants and Infants in Rural Areas - Study Delegate Lewis, R. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 82
Health and Government Operations
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1197 (SB0706) Telehealth - Coverage for Breast Cancer Services Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB1416 Drugs and Devices - Electronic Prescriptions - Requirements Delegate Saab 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB1519 (SB1024) Self-Referrals - Oncology Group Practices - Exemption Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB1540 Health Care Facilities - Closing or Partial Closing - Public Notice Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1574 Maryland Health Care Commission - Health Record and Payment Integration Program Advisory Committee Delegate Hill 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2018 - 1:00 PM
Rules
SB0013 /CH0436 (HB0115/CH0435) Maryland Health Care Commission – Electronic Prescription Records System – Assessment and Report Senator Rosapepe 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 436
Finance
1/31/2018 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0017 /CH0657 Health Information Exchanges - Definitions and Regulations Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 657
Finance
1/18/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0108 /CH0661 Regulation of Health Care Programs, Medical Laboratories, Tissue Banks, and Health Care Facilities - Revisions Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 661
Finance
1/18/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0266 /CH0083 (HB0716/CH0082) Maryland Health Care Commission – Mortality Rates of African American Infants and Infants in Rural Areas – Study Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 83
Finance
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0682 /CH0605 Emergency Medical Services Providers – Coverage and Reimbursement of Services – Reports and Plan Senator Hershey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 605
Finance
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0706 (HB1197) Telehealth – Coverage for Breast Cancer Services Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0896 /CH0452 Maryland Health Care Commission – Health Record and Payment Integration Program Advisory Committee Senator Guzzone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 452
Finance
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1024 (HB1519) Self-Referrals - Oncology Group Practices - Exemption Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM