Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Health Planning and Cost Review

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0185 (SB0843)
Title
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Health Improvement and Cost Savings Act of 2013
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0228 /CH0159 (SB0274)
Title
Maryland Health Progress Act of 2013
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1252 /CH0291 (SB0582/CH0290)
Title
Health Insurance - Federal Mental Health Parity and Addiction Equity Act - Utilization Review Criteria and Standards
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1501 (SB0977)
Title
Task Force to Evaluate Regional Health Delivery and Health Planning in Rural Areas
Sponsor
Delegate Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0274 (HB0228/CH0159)
Title
Maryland Health Progress Act of 2013
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0582 /CH0290 (HB1252/CH0291)
Title
Health Insurance - Federal Mental Health Parity and Addiction Equity Act - Utilization Review Criteria and Standards
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0693
Title
Health - Certified Nurse-Midwives and Freestanding Birthing Centers - Certificate of Need and Practice Privileges
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0843 (HB0185)
Title
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Health Improvement and Cost Savings Act of 2013
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0975
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission - Certificate of Need Review - Interested Party
Sponsor
Senator Pipkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0977 (HB1501)
Title
Task Force to Evaluate Regional Health Delivery and Health Planning in Rural Areas
Sponsor
Senator Pipkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0185 (SB0843) State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Health Improvement and Cost Savings Act of 2013 Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0228 /CH0159 (SB0274) Maryland Health Progress Act of 2013 Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 159
Health and Government Operations
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1252 /CH0291 (SB0582/CH0290) Health Insurance - Federal Mental Health Parity and Addiction Equity Act - Utilization Review Criteria and Standards Delegate Kelly, A. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 291
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1501 (SB0977) Task Force to Evaluate Regional Health Delivery and Health Planning in Rural Areas Delegate Eckardt 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0274 (HB0228/CH0159) Maryland Health Progress Act of 2013 President 3 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0582 /CH0290 (HB1252/CH0291) Health Insurance - Federal Mental Health Parity and Addiction Equity Act - Utilization Review Criteria and Standards Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 290
Finance
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0693 Health - Certified Nurse-Midwives and Freestanding Birthing Centers - Certificate of Need and Practice Privileges Senator Montgomery 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0843 (HB0185) State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Health Improvement and Cost Savings Act of 2013 Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0975 Maryland Health Care Commission - Certificate of Need Review - Interested Party Senator Pipkin 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB0977 (HB1501) Task Force to Evaluate Regional Health Delivery and Health Planning in Rural Areas Senator Pipkin 2 2 In the House - Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Finance
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM