Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Health Planning and Cost Review

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0025 (SB0452)
Title
Health Insurance - Group Health Benefit Plans - Renewal Premium Rate Calculation Statement
Sponsor
Delegate Wivell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0124 /CH0055 (SB0212/CH0054)
Title
Health Insurance - Large Employers - Disclosure of Aggregate Incurred Claims
Sponsor
Delegate Hammen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0489 /CH0321
Title
Termination of Maryland Health Insurance Plan, Transfer of Senior Prescription Drug Assistance Program, and Funding for State Reinsurance Program
Sponsor
Delegate Hammen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0715 (SB0644)
Title
Early Identification of Autism Act
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0800
Title
Health Insurance - Payments to Noncontracting Specialists and Noncontracting Nonphysician Specialists
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1006 (SB0648)
Title
Health Insurance - Coverage for Digital Tomosynthesis
Sponsor
Delegate Sample-Hughes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1181 /CH0303 (SB0939)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Determinations of Eligibility for Long-Term Care Services - Reports and Meetings
Sponsor
Delegate Morgan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1267
Title
Poly-Morphone-Assisted Treatment Pilot Program - Harm Reduction Act of 2016
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1318 /CH0309 (SB0929)
Title
Health Benefit Plans - Network Access Standards and Provider Network Directories
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1350 (SB0707/CH0420)
Title
Freestanding Medical Facilities - Certificate of Need, Rates, and Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Hammen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1505 (SB0335)
Title
Health Insurance - Assignment of Benefits and Reimbursement of Nonpreferred Providers - Modifications
Sponsor
Delegate Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0212 /CH0054 (HB0124/CH0055)
Title
Health Insurance - Large Employers - Disclosure of Aggregate Incurred Claims
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0334
Title
Health Insurance - Access to Accurate Provider Directories
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0335 (HB1505)
Title
Health Insurance - Assignment of Benefits and Reimbursement of Nonpreferred Providers - Modifications
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0352 /CH0191
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission - Certificate of Need Review - Interested Party
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0452 (HB0025)
Title
Health Insurance - Group Health Benefit Plans - Renewal Premium Rate Calculation Statement
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0644 (HB0715)
Title
Early Identification of Autism Act
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0648 (HB1006)
Title
Health Insurance - Coverage for Digital Tomosynthesis
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0707 /CH0420 (HB1350)
Title
Freestanding Medical Facilities - Certificate of Need, Rates, and Definition
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0929 (HB1318/CH0309)
Title
Health Benefit Plans - Network Access Standards and Provider Network Directories
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0939 (HB1181/CH0303)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Determinations of Eligibility for Long-Term Care Services - Reports and Meetings
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0025 (SB0452) Health Insurance - Group Health Benefit Plans - Renewal Premium Rate Calculation Statement Delegate Wivell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
1/28/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0124 /CH0055 (SB0212/CH0054) Health Insurance - Large Employers - Disclosure of Aggregate Incurred Claims Delegate Hammen 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 55
Health and Government Operations
1/28/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0489 /CH0321 Termination of Maryland Health Insurance Plan, Transfer of Senior Prescription Drug Assistance Program, and Funding for State Reinsurance Program Delegate Hammen 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 321
Health and Government Operations
2/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0715 (SB0644) Early Identification of Autism Act Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0800 Health Insurance - Payments to Noncontracting Specialists and Noncontracting Nonphysician Specialists Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1006 (SB0648) Health Insurance - Coverage for Digital Tomosynthesis Delegate Sample-Hughes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1181 /CH0303 (SB0939) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Determinations of Eligibility for Long-Term Care Services - Reports and Meetings Delegate Morgan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 303
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1267 Poly-Morphone-Assisted Treatment Pilot Program - Harm Reduction Act of 2016 Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1318 /CH0309 (SB0929) Health Benefit Plans - Network Access Standards and Provider Network Directories Delegate Kelly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 309
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1350 (SB0707/CH0420) Freestanding Medical Facilities - Certificate of Need, Rates, and Definition Delegate Hammen 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Finance (Senator Middleton)
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1505 (SB0335) Health Insurance - Assignment of Benefits and Reimbursement of Nonpreferred Providers - Modifications Delegate Hayes 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0212 /CH0054 (HB0124/CH0055) Health Insurance - Large Employers - Disclosure of Aggregate Incurred Claims Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 54
Finance
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0334 Health Insurance - Access to Accurate Provider Directories Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0335 (HB1505) Health Insurance - Assignment of Benefits and Reimbursement of Nonpreferred Providers - Modifications Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0352 /CH0191 Maryland Health Care Commission - Certificate of Need Review - Interested Party Senator Hershey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 191
Finance
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0452 (HB0025) Health Insurance - Group Health Benefit Plans - Renewal Premium Rate Calculation Statement Senator Serafini 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0644 (HB0715) Early Identification of Autism Act Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0648 (HB1006) Health Insurance - Coverage for Digital Tomosynthesis Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0707 /CH0420 (HB1350) Freestanding Medical Facilities - Certificate of Need, Rates, and Definition Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 420
Finance
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0929 (HB1318/CH0309) Health Benefit Plans - Network Access Standards and Provider Network Directories Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Finance
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0939 (HB1181/CH0303) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Determinations of Eligibility for Long-Term Care Services - Reports and Meetings Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM