Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Health Planning and Cost Review

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0063
Title
Health Care Practitioners - Cost Estimate Notice - Required
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0675 /CH0676 (SB0061/CH0677)
Title
Health Insurance - Coverage for Digital Tomosynthesis
Sponsor
Delegate Sample-Hughes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0061 /CH0677 (HB0675/CH0676)
Title
Health Insurance - Coverage for Digital Tomosynthesis
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0063 Health Care Practitioners - Cost Estimate Notice - Required Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0675 /CH0676 (SB0061/CH0677) Health Insurance - Coverage for Digital Tomosynthesis Delegate Sample-Hughes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 676
Health and Government Operations
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0061 /CH0677 (HB0675/CH0676) Health Insurance - Coverage for Digital Tomosynthesis Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 677
Finance
1/25/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM