Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Health Planning and Cost Review

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0086 /CH0432 (SB0656/CH0433)
Title
Health Insurance - Coverage for Elevated or Impaired Blood Glucose Levels, Prediabetes, and Obesity Treatment
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0292
Title
Health Insurance - Group Health Benefit Plans - Disclosure of Information
Sponsor
Delegate Wivell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0660
Title
Public Health - State-Provided Health Care Benefits for State Residents (HealthcareMaryland)
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0779
Title
Maryland Healthy Working Families Act - Exemption - Facility With On-Site Health Clinic
Sponsor
Delegate Wivell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1516 (SB1002)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment (Healthy Maryland Act of 2018)
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1002 (HB1516)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment (Healthy Maryland Act of 2018)
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0086 /CH0432 (SB0656/CH0433) Health Insurance - Coverage for Elevated or Impaired Blood Glucose Levels, Prediabetes, and Obesity Treatment Delegate Barron 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 432
Health and Government Operations
1/31/2018 - 2:00 PM
Finance
4/04/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0292 Health Insurance - Group Health Benefit Plans - Disclosure of Information Delegate Wivell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0660 Public Health - State-Provided Health Care Benefits for State Residents (HealthcareMaryland) Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB0779 Maryland Healthy Working Families Act - Exemption - Facility With On-Site Health Clinic Delegate Wivell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1516 (SB1002) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment (Healthy Maryland Act of 2018) Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1002 (HB1516) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment (Healthy Maryland Act of 2018) Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM