Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Health Services Cost Review Commission

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0614 (SB0390)
Title
Hospitals - Changes in Status - Hospital Employee Retraining and Placement
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1516 (SB1002)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment (Healthy Maryland Act of 2018)
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0187 /CH0010 (HB0161)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2018
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0390 (HB0614)
Title
Hospitals - Changes in Status - Hospital Employee Retraining and Placement
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1002 (HB1516)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment (Healthy Maryland Act of 2018)
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0614 (SB0390) Hospitals - Changes in Status - Hospital Employee Retraining and Placement Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1516 (SB1002) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment (Healthy Maryland Act of 2018) Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0187 /CH0010 (HB0161) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2018 President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 10
Budget and Taxation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0390 (HB0614) Hospitals - Changes in Status - Hospital Employee Retraining and Placement Senator Feldman 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB1002 (HB1516) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment (Healthy Maryland Act of 2018) Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM