Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Hearing Aids

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0596 /CH0040
Title
State Department of Education - Hearing Aid Loan Bank Program - Age of Eligibility
Sponsor
Delegate Flanagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0109 /CH0048
Title
Health Occupations Boards - Criminal History Records Checks - Required
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0596 /CH0040 State Department of Education - Hearing Aid Loan Bank Program - Age of Eligibility Delegate Flanagan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 40
Ways and Means
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0109 /CH0048 Health Occupations Boards - Criminal History Records Checks - Required Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 48
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/27/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM