Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Highway Administration, State

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0247
Title
Vehicle Laws - Road Rage Reduction Act of 2014
Sponsor
Delegate Hogan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0852
Title
Highways - Scenic Byways - Signs
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0873 (SB1001)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Divided Highways - Speed Limits and Crosswalks
Sponsor
Delegate Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0878 /CH0430 (SB0814)
Title
State Highway Administration - Compost and Compost-Based Products - Specification
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0911 (SB0677)
Title
Public Safety - Highway Work Zones - Off-Duty Law Enforcement Officers Required
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1246 /CH0450 (SB0771)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Exceptional Milk Hauling Permit - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1454
Title
Winter Driving Safety Act
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0086 /CH0127
Title
Vehicle Laws - Size, Weight, and Axle Load Limits
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0677 (HB0911)
Title
Public Safety - Highway Work Zones - Off-Duty Law Enforcement Officers Required
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0771 (HB1246/CH0450)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Exceptional Milk Hauling Permit - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Robey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0814 (HB0878/CH0430)
Title
State Highway Administration - Compost and Compost-Based Products - Specification
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0900
Title
Department of Transportation - Highway Needs Inventory - Four-Lane Highways
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1001 (HB0873)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Divided Highways - Crosswalks
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0247 Vehicle Laws - Road Rage Reduction Act of 2014 Delegate Hogan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0852 Highways - Scenic Byways - Signs Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0873 (SB1001) Vehicle Laws - Divided Highways - Speed Limits and Crosswalks Delegate Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Senate Refuses to Recede
Environmental Matters
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0878 /CH0430 (SB0814) State Highway Administration - Compost and Compost-Based Products - Specification Delegate Stein 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 430
Environmental Matters
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2014 - 1:45 PM
HB0911 (SB0677) Public Safety - Highway Work Zones - Off-Duty Law Enforcement Officers Required Delegate Beidle 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1246 /CH0450 (SB0771) Motor Vehicles - Exceptional Milk Hauling Permit - Establishment Delegate Malone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 450
Environmental Matters
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1454 Winter Driving Safety Act Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0086 /CH0127 Vehicle Laws - Size, Weight, and Axle Load Limits Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 127
Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0677 (HB0911) Public Safety - Highway Work Zones - Off-Duty Law Enforcement Officers Required Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0771 (HB1246/CH0450) Motor Vehicles - Exceptional Milk Hauling Permit - Establishment Senator Robey 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0814 (HB0878/CH0430) State Highway Administration - Compost and Compost-Based Products - Specification Senator Raskin 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0900 Department of Transportation - Highway Needs Inventory - Four-Lane Highways Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1001 (HB0873) Vehicle Laws - Divided Highways - Crosswalks Senator Mathias 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM