Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Highway Administration, State

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0004 /CH0020
Title
Toll Bridges – Renaming Harry W. Nice Memorial Bridge – Harry W. Nice/Thomas "Mac" Middleton Bridge
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0054 (SB0024/CH0223)
Title
State Highway Administration - Sale or Lease of Naming Rights for Rest Areas and Welcome Centers
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0330 /CH0174 (SB0215/CH0175)
Title
Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - Town of Vienna
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0465 /CH0086
Title
Vehicle Laws - Golf Carts - City of Crisfield
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0515 /CH0246
Title
Agriculture – Palmer Amaranth – Study
Sponsor
Delegate Ghrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0744 /CH0717 (SB0850/CH0718)
Title
Transportation - Complete Streets Policy - Adoption
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0959
Title
Vehicle Laws - Pedestrian Hybrid Beacons
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0961 /CH0176
Title
Rural Broadband Communication Services
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0977
Title
State Highway Administration Neighbor Notification Act
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1139
Title
Baltimore City – Vehicle Height Monitoring Systems – Enforcement
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1281
Title
State Highway Administration - Project Planning Documents - Public Access
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1380
Title
State Highway Administration - Access to State Highways - Consideration of Pedestrian, Bicycle, and Public Transportation Activity
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1406 (SB0872/CH0325)
Title
Vehicle Laws – Special Event Zones – Worcester County
Sponsor
Delegate Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1412
Title
Vehicle Laws - High Occupancy Vehicle (HOV) Lanes - Hours of Operation on U.S. Route 50
Sponsor
Delegate Saab
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1771
Title
Motor Vehicle Registration – Exception for Low Speed Electric Vehicles – City of Havre de Grace
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0024 /CH0223 (HB0054)
Title
State Highway Administration - Sale or Lease of Naming Rights for Rest Areas and Welcome Centers
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0055
Title
Vehicle Laws - Speed Restrictions - Expressways and Interstate Highways
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0215 /CH0175 (HB0330/CH0174)
Title
Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - Town of Vienna
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0850 /CH0718 (HB0744/CH0717)
Title
Transportation - Complete Streets Policy - Adoption
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0872 /CH0325 (HB1406)
Title
Vehicle Laws – Special Event Zones – Worcester County
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0906
Title
Construction of a Highway or County Road - Commercial Property - Access Roads
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0004 /CH0020 Toll Bridges – Renaming Harry W. Nice Memorial Bridge – Harry W. Nice/Thomas "Mac" Middleton Bridge Delegate Jameson 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 20
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0054 (SB0024/CH0223) State Highway Administration - Sale or Lease of Naming Rights for Rest Areas and Welcome Centers Delegate Lam 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0330 /CH0174 (SB0215/CH0175) Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - Town of Vienna Delegate Mautz 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 174
Environment and Transportation
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0465 /CH0086 Vehicle Laws - Golf Carts - City of Crisfield Delegate Otto 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 86
Environment and Transportation
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0515 /CH0246 Agriculture – Palmer Amaranth – Study Delegate Ghrist 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 246
Environment and Transportation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0744 /CH0717 (SB0850/CH0718) Transportation - Complete Streets Policy - Adoption Delegate Lafferty 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 717
Environment and Transportation
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0959 Vehicle Laws - Pedestrian Hybrid Beacons Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0961 /CH0176 Rural Broadband Communication Services Delegate Mautz 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 176
Economic Matters
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0977 State Highway Administration Neighbor Notification Act Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1139 Baltimore City – Vehicle Height Monitoring Systems – Enforcement Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1281 State Highway Administration - Project Planning Documents - Public Access Delegate Korman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/09/2018 - 2:30 PM
HB1380 State Highway Administration - Access to State Highways - Consideration of Pedestrian, Bicycle, and Public Transportation Activity Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/09/2018 - 2:30 PM
HB1406 (SB0872/CH0325) Vehicle Laws – Special Event Zones – Worcester County Delegate Carozza 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1412 Vehicle Laws - High Occupancy Vehicle (HOV) Lanes - Hours of Operation on U.S. Route 50 Delegate Saab 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1771 Motor Vehicle Registration – Exception for Low Speed Electric Vehicles – City of Havre de Grace Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0024 /CH0223 (HB0054) State Highway Administration - Sale or Lease of Naming Rights for Rest Areas and Welcome Centers Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 223
Finance
1/24/2018 - 2:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0055 Vehicle Laws - Speed Restrictions - Expressways and Interstate Highways Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/18/2018 - 3:00 PM
SB0215 /CH0175 (HB0330/CH0174) Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - Town of Vienna Senator Eckardt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 175
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0850 /CH0718 (HB0744/CH0717) Transportation - Complete Streets Policy - Adoption Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 718
Finance
3/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0872 /CH0325 (HB1406) Vehicle Laws – Special Event Zones – Worcester County Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 325
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0906 Construction of a Highway or County Road - Commercial Property - Access Roads Senator Waugh 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM