Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Home Care Services -see also- Respite Care

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0769 /CH0068 (SB0216/CH0067)
Title
Maryland Caregivers Support Coordinating Council - Renaming and Altering Membership and Duties
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0857 /CH0584
Title
Maryland Mental Health Law - Small Private Group Home - Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Angel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0984 (SB0475)
Title
Developmental Disabilities Administration - Crisis Resolution and Crisis Prevention Services - Funding and Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0216 /CH0067 (HB0769/CH0068)
Title
Maryland Caregivers Support Coordinating Council - Renaming and Altering Membership and Duties
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0475 (HB0984)
Title
Developmental Disabilities Administration - Crisis Resolution and Crisis Prevention Services - Funding and Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0532
Title
Temporary Family Health Care Structures - Permits
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0769 /CH0068 (SB0216/CH0067) Maryland Caregivers Support Coordinating Council - Renaming and Altering Membership and Duties Delegate West 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 68
Health and Government Operations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0857 /CH0584 Maryland Mental Health Law - Small Private Group Home - Definition Delegate Angel 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 584
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0984 (SB0475) Developmental Disabilities Administration - Crisis Resolution and Crisis Prevention Services - Funding and Reporting Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
Appropriations
SB0216 /CH0067 (HB0769/CH0068) Maryland Caregivers Support Coordinating Council - Renaming and Altering Membership and Duties Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 67
Finance
2/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0475 (HB0984) Developmental Disabilities Administration - Crisis Resolution and Crisis Prevention Services - Funding and Reporting Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0532 Temporary Family Health Care Structures - Permits Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM