Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Homeowners Associations

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0320
Title
Baltimore County - Nuisance Actions - Community Association Standing
Sponsor
Baltimore County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0413
Title
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Amendment of Governing Documents
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0472 (SB0493)
Title
Real Property - Residential Leases - Collectible Rent (Rent Transparency Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0481 (SB0681)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Seneca Park North
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0564 (SB0432)
Title
Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Governing Bodies
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0575 /CH0345
Title
Condominiums - Suspension of Use of Common Elements
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0602
Title
Real Property - Installation and Use of Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0669 /CH0332
Title
Real Property - Homeowners Associations - Number of Declarant Votes
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1007 (SB0883)
Title
Homeowners Association Act - Boards of Directors, Voting, Meetings, Recordation, and Rules
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1066
Title
Homeowners Associations - Recorded Covenants or Restrictions - Deletion of Restrictions Based on Race, Religious Belief, or National Origin
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1097 (SB0931)
Title
Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Dispute Settlement
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1158 (SB1209)
Title
Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0065
Title
Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0095
Title
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations – Voting, Records, and Conflicts of Interest
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0216
Title
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Priority of Liens - Included Charges
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0432 (HB0564)
Title
Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Governing Bodies
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0493 (HB0472)
Title
Real Property - Residential Leases - Collectible Rent (Rent Transparency Act)
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0621 /CH0636
Title
Real Property - Deletion of Ownership Restrictions Based on Race, Religious Belief, or National Origin
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0681 (HB0481)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Seneca Park North
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0777
Title
Aquaculture Leases - Notice - Homeowners Associations
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0883 (HB1007)
Title
Homeowners Association Act - Boards of Directors, Voting, Meetings, Recordation, and Rules
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0931 (HB1097)
Title
Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Dispute Settlement
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0320 Baltimore County - Nuisance Actions - Community Association Standing Baltimore County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0413 Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Amendment of Governing Documents Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0472 (SB0493) Real Property - Residential Leases - Collectible Rent (Rent Transparency Act) Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB0481 (SB0681) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Seneca Park North Delegate Barkley 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2018 - 4:00 PM
HB0564 (SB0432) Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Governing Bodies Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0575 /CH0345 Condominiums - Suspension of Use of Common Elements Delegate Holmes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 345
Environment and Transportation
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0602 Real Property - Installation and Use of Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment Delegate Lam 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0669 /CH0332 Real Property - Homeowners Associations - Number of Declarant Votes Delegate Beidle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 332
Environment and Transportation
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1007 (SB0883) Homeowners Association Act - Boards of Directors, Voting, Meetings, Recordation, and Rules Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1066 Homeowners Associations - Recorded Covenants or Restrictions - Deletion of Restrictions Based on Race, Religious Belief, or National Origin Delegate West 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1097 (SB0931) Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Dispute Settlement Delegate Healey 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1158 (SB1209) Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0065 Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0095 Condominiums and Homeowners Associations – Voting, Records, and Conflicts of Interest Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0216 Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Priority of Liens - Included Charges Senator Norman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/31/2018 - 2:00 PM
SB0432 (HB0564) Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Governing Bodies Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0493 (HB0472) Real Property - Residential Leases - Collectible Rent (Rent Transparency Act) Senator Norman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0621 /CH0636 Real Property - Deletion of Ownership Restrictions Based on Race, Religious Belief, or National Origin Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 636
Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0681 (HB0481) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Seneca Park North Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 2:00 PM
SB0777 Aquaculture Leases - Notice - Homeowners Associations Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0883 (HB1007) Homeowners Association Act - Boards of Directors, Voting, Meetings, Recordation, and Rules Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0931 (HB1097) Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Dispute Settlement Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM