Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Horse Industry Board

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0815 /CH0497 (SB1116)
Title
Horse Racing - Fair Hill - Arabian Breed Racing Authorization
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1116 (HB0815/CH0497)
Title
Horse Racing - Fair Hill - Arabian Breed Racing Authorization
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0815 /CH0497 (SB1116) Horse Racing - Fair Hill - Arabian Breed Racing Authorization Cecil County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 497
Ways and Means
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1116 (HB0815/CH0497) Horse Racing - Fair Hill - Arabian Breed Racing Authorization Senator Norman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM