Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Hospices

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0407 /CH0439 (SB0232/CH0440)
Title
Public Health - General Hospice Care Programs - Collection and Disposal of Unused Prescription Medication
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1036 (SB0634)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Queen Anne's County - Compass Regional Hospice
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0232 /CH0440 (HB0407/CH0439)
Title
Public Health – General Hospice Care Programs – Collection and Disposal of Unused Prescription Medication
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0634 (HB1036)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Queen Anne's County - Compass Regional Hospice
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1170
Title
Creation of a State Debt – Worcester County – Macky and Pam Stansell House of Coastal Hospice at the Ocean
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0407 /CH0439 (SB0232/CH0440) Public Health - General Hospice Care Programs - Collection and Disposal of Unused Prescription Medication Delegate Cullison 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 439
Health and Government Operations
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1036 (SB0634) Creation of a State Debt - Queen Anne's County - Compass Regional Hospice Delegate Arentz 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2018 - 2:00 PM
SB0232 /CH0440 (HB0407/CH0439) Public Health – General Hospice Care Programs – Collection and Disposal of Unused Prescription Medication Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 440
Finance
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0634 (HB1036) Creation of a State Debt - Queen Anne's County - Compass Regional Hospice Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 10:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 10:00 AM
SB1170 Creation of a State Debt – Worcester County – Macky and Pam Stansell House of Coastal Hospice at the Ocean Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 2:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM