Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Hotels and Motels

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0935 (SB0823)
Title
Maryland Commission on Civil Rights – Civil Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1003 /CH0225
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses Issued by Different Local Licensing Boards to Single License Holder - Authorized
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1393 /CH0761
Title
Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Interest in Multiple Licenses
Sponsor
Baltimore County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1396 /CH0763
Title
Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine, and Liquor License
Sponsor
Baltimore County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1422 /CH0242 (SB1072/CH0243)
Title
Caroline County - Alcoholic Beverages - Bed and Breakfast License
Sponsor
Caroline County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1575 /CH0765
Title
Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Multiple Class B Licenses
Sponsor
Baltimore County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1604
Title
Business Regulation - Limited Residential Lodging
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0823 (HB0935)
Title
Maryland Commission on Civil Rights - Civil Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1072 /CH0243 (HB1422/CH0242)
Title
Caroline County - Alcoholic Beverages - Bed and Breakfast License
Sponsor
Caroline County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1081
Title
Business Regulation - Limited Residential Lodging
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1225
Title
Anne Arundel County - Short-Term Residential Rentals - Taxation and Regulation
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0935 (SB0823) Maryland Commission on Civil Rights – Civil Penalties Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1003 /CH0225 Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses Issued by Different Local Licensing Boards to Single License Holder - Authorized Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 225
Economic Matters
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1393 /CH0761 Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Interest in Multiple Licenses Baltimore County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 761
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1396 /CH0763 Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine, and Liquor License Baltimore County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 763
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1422 /CH0242 (SB1072/CH0243) Caroline County - Alcoholic Beverages - Bed and Breakfast License Caroline County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 242
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1575 /CH0765 Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Multiple Class B Licenses Baltimore County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 765
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/05/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1604 Business Regulation - Limited Residential Lodging Delegate Frick 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/09/2018 - 2:30 PM
SB0823 (HB0935) Maryland Commission on Civil Rights - Civil Penalties Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1072 /CH0243 (HB1422/CH0242) Caroline County - Alcoholic Beverages - Bed and Breakfast License Caroline County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 243
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB1081 Business Regulation - Limited Residential Lodging Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/04/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1225 Anne Arundel County - Short-Term Residential Rentals - Taxation and Regulation Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM